Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0927073

EP0927073 - HYDROMECHANICAL MIXING APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING A MIXTURE OF POWDER OR GRANULAR STATE MATERIAL AND LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.10.2002
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Energiagazdálkodási Részvénytársaság
33-34, Bem rakpart
H-1027 Budapest / HU
[2001/50]
Former [1999/27]For all designated states
Energiagazdálkodási Részvénytársaság
33-34, Bem rakpart
H-1027 Budapest II / HU
Inventor(s)01 / SZIVAK, Attila
Ro "zse u. 6-8
H-1125 Budapest / HU
02 / HANGYAL, János
Sport u. 24
H-2083 Solymár / HU
03 / KISS, J®zsef
R®na köz 14
H-1149 Budapest / HU
04 / KOCSIS, Gábor
Kuruclesi ®t 37/b
H-1021 Budapest / HU
 [2001/50]
Former [1999/27]01 / SZIV K, Attila
Ro "zse u. 6-8
H-1125 Budapest / HU
02 / HANGY L, János
Sport u. 24
H-2083 Solymár / HU
03 / KISS, J®zsef
R®na köz 14
H-1149 Budapest / HU
04 / KOCSIS, Gábor
Kuruclesi ®t 37/b
H-1021 Budapest / HU
Representative(s)Vleck, Jan Montagu
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/27]Vleck, Jan Montagu
Reddie & Grose, 16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date97940268.201.09.1997
[1999/27]
WO1997HU00046
Priority number, dateHU1996000237930.08.1996         Original published format: HU 9602379
HU1997000134301.08.1997         Original published format: HU 9701343
[1999/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9808596
Date:05.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0927073
Date:07.07.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.1998
[1999/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0927073
Date:12.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.03.1998
ClassificationInternational:B01F3/12, B01F5/00, B01F5/02
[1999/27]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR [1999/27]
Extension statesRO08.03.1999
SI08.03.1999
TitleGerman:HYDROMECHANISCHES MISCHGERÄT ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MISCHUNG AUS PULVER ODER MATERIAL IN GRANULATZUSTAND UND FLÜSSIGKEIT[1999/27]
English:HYDROMECHANICAL MIXING APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING A MIXTURE OF POWDER OR GRANULAR STATE MATERIAL AND LIQUID[1999/27]
French:APPAREIL DE MELANGE HYDROMECANIQUE SERVANT A PRODUIRE UN MELANGE DE MATIERE A L'ETAT PULVERULENT OU GRANULAIRE ET DE LIQUIDE[1999/27]
Entry into regional phase08.03.1999National basic fee paid 
08.03.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
08.03.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.03.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.03.1999Examination requested  [1999/27]
13.10.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.02.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.12.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.04.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.07.2001Fee for grant paid
18.07.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE12.12.2001
FI12.12.2001
FR12.12.2001
GR12.12.2001
ES27.06.2002
GB01.09.2002
[2006/14]
Former [2004/21]BE12.12.2001
FI12.12.2001
GR12.12.2001
ES27.06.2002
GB01.09.2002
Former [2004/04]BE12.12.2001
FI12.12.2001
GR12.12.2001
ES27.06.2002
Former [2003/06]BE12.12.2001
FI12.12.2001
GR12.12.2001
Former [2002/49]FI12.12.2001
GR12.12.2001
Former [2002/33]FI12.12.2001
Cited inInternational search[A]DE2602858  (MELYEPITESI TERVEZO VALLALAT) [A] 1-8 * page 7, line 3 - page 8, line 29; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4007921  (ZINGG WARREN M) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 49 - column 5, line 20; figure 1 *;
 [A]US3741533  (WINN F) [A] 1-8 * abstract *;
 [A]US5368385  (ADAMO JOSEPH R [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract *;
 [A]US3891393  (WEEKS LORNE E, et al) [A] 1-8 * column 2, lines 14-64; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2071846  (LAMB CHARLES P, et al) [A] 1-8 * column 1, line 55 - column 3, line 32; figures 1,2 *