Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0920729

EP0920729 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR RECEIVING A MODULATED RADIO FREQUENCY SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2019Change - classificationpublished on 13.02.2019  [2019/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC.
5204 East Ben White Boulevard M/S 562
Austin TX 78741 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/23]For all designated states
Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.
Mail Stop 562, 5204 East Ben White Boulevard
Austin, TX 78741 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ZUCKERMAN, Lawrence, H.
3308 Hudson Court
Pleasanton, CA 94588 / US
[1999/23]
Representative(s)Wright, Hugh Ronald , et al
Brookes Batchellor LLP
1 Boyne Park
Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/23]Wright, Hugh Ronald , et al
Brookes & Martin High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn
London WC1V 6SE / GB
Application number, filing date97940564.418.08.1997
[1999/23]
WO1997US14472
Priority number, dateUS1996069999120.08.1996         Original published format: US 699991
[1999/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9808300
Date:26.02.1998
Language:EN
[1998/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0920729
Date:09.06.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.1998
[1999/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0920729
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.02.1998
ClassificationInternational:H03D3/00
[1999/23]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [1999/23]
TitleGerman:ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM EMPFANGEN EINES MODULIERTEN FUNKFREQUENZSIGNALS[1999/23]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR RECEIVING A MODULATED RADIO FREQUENCY SIGNAL[1999/23]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE RECEPTION D'UN SIGNAL RF MODULE[1999/23]
Entry into regional phase15.07.1998National basic fee paid 
15.07.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
15.07.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.02.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.07.1998Examination requested  [1999/23]
22.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.01.2000Fee for grant paid
05.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT05.04.2000
[2018/01]
Former [2008/08]IT05.04.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]US5345187  (MCGUIRE RONALD F) [A] 1,2,10,16,18 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9520851  (MOTOROLA INC) [A] 1,9,10,16 * page 3, line 8 - page 4, line 12 *;
 [A]US4653117  (HECK JOSEPH P) [A] 1,10,16 * abstract *;
 [A]US5109531  (HECK JOSEPH P) [A] 1,10,16 * column 1, line 55 - column 3, line 36; figures 1,3 *