Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0907927

EP0907927 - SCANNERS FOR READING NEAR INFRARED FLUORESCENT MARKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.10.2002
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ISOTAG TECHNOLOGY, INC.
13899 Biscayne Boulevard Suite PH North Miami Beach
Florida 33181 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]For all designated states
ISOTAG TECHNOLOGY, INC.
13899 Biscayne Boulevard Suite PH
North Miami Beach, Florida 33181 / US
Former [1999/15]For all designated states
Eastman Chemical Company
100 North Eastman Road, P.O. Box 511
Kingsport, TN 37662 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CYR, Michael, John
204 Coralwood Drive
Kingsport, TN 37663 / US
02 / KRUTAK, James, John, Sr.
6305 Booth Court
Kingsport, TN 37663 / US
03 / CLAUBERG, Horst
2601 John B. Dennis 210
Kingsport, TN 37660 / US
04 / MEADE, Randy, Barnett
2104 Louita Avenue
Kingsport, TN 37660 / US
05 / MOORE, James, Edward
5128 Moody Drive
Kingsport, TN 37664 / US
06 / PATONAY, Gabor
2779 Dennard Road
Conyers, GA 30208 / US
[1999/15]
Representative(s)Evans, David Charles
40-43 Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1JQ / GB
[1999/15]
Application number, filing date97941005.723.06.1997
[1999/15]
WO1997US16028
Priority number, dateUS19960020308P24.06.1996         Original published format: US 20308 P
US1997088003720.06.1997         Original published format: US 880037
[1999/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9750053
Date:31.12.1997
Language:EN
[1997/57]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0907927
Date:14.04.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.1997
[1999/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0907927
Date:12.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.06.1998
ClassificationInternational:G06K7/12
[1999/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/15]
TitleGerman:ABTASTERS ZUM LESEN VON NAH-INFRAROTEN FLUORESZENTEN MARKIERUNGEN[1999/15]
English:SCANNERS FOR READING NEAR INFRARED FLUORESCENT MARKS[1999/15]
French:SCANNERS DE LECTURE DE MARQUES FLUORESCENTES DANS LE PROCHE INFRAROUGE[1999/15]
Entry into regional phase25.01.1999National basic fee paid 
25.01.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.01.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.01.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.01.1999Examination requested  [1999/15]
29.11.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.05.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
02.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
18.06.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.08.2001Fee for grant paid
24.08.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP01201922.0  / EP1126401
Opposition(s)13.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
22.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
07.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.12.2001
BE12.12.2001
CH12.12.2001
FI12.12.2001
GR12.12.2001
LI12.12.2001
NL12.12.2001
DK12.03.2002
PT12.03.2002
SE12.03.2002
LU23.06.2002
ES27.06.2002
[2004/39]
Former [2004/04]AT12.12.2001
BE12.12.2001
CH12.12.2001
FI12.12.2001
GR12.12.2001
LI12.12.2001
NL12.12.2001
DK12.03.2002
PT12.03.2002
SE12.03.2002
ES27.06.2002
Former [2003/46]AT12.12.2001
BE12.12.2001
CH12.12.2001
FI12.12.2001
GR12.12.2001
LI12.12.2001
NL12.12.2001
DK12.03.2002
PT12.03.2002
SE12.03.2002
Former [2003/09]AT12.12.2001
BE12.12.2001
CH12.12.2001
FI12.12.2001
GR12.12.2001
LI12.12.2001
NL12.12.2001
PT12.03.2002
SE12.03.2002
Former [2003/06]BE12.12.2001
CH12.12.2001
FI12.12.2001
GR12.12.2001
LI12.12.2001
NL12.12.2001
PT12.03.2002
SE12.03.2002
Former [2003/01]CH12.12.2001
FI12.12.2001
GR12.12.2001
LI12.12.2001
PT12.03.2002
SE12.03.2002
Former [2002/49]FI12.12.2001
GR12.12.2001
PT12.03.2002
SE12.03.2002
Former [2002/48]FI12.12.2001
PT12.03.2002
SE12.03.2002
Former [2002/33]FI12.12.2001
SE12.03.2002
Former [2002/27]SE12.03.2002
Cited inInternational search[X]US5331140  (STEPHANY JOSEPH F [US]) [X] 1-6,8-11,17-19,24-27,32,33,39,40 * the whole document *;
 [DA]US4983817  (DOLASH THOMAS M [US], et al) [DA] 1-10,17-19,24-30,32-44 * column 4, line 67 - column 12, line 63; figures 1-14 *;
 [A]GB2287533  (HITACHI MAXELL [JP], et al) [A] 1-44 * page 5 - page 19; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]EP0595583  (CANON KK [JP])