Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0927185

EP0927185 - PHOSPHORUS-CONTAINING FLUOROMONOMERS AND POLYMERS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.09.2008
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.10.2008  [2008/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
[N/P]
Former [2007/46]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street Wilmington
Delaware 19898 / US
Former [2001/36]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US
Former [1999/27]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY INCORPORATED
1007 Market Street
Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BROTHERS, Paul, Douglas
112 Millbrook Drive
Chadds Ford, PA 19317 / US
02 / HUNG, Ming-Hong
601 Andover Road
Wilmington, DE 19803 / US
03 / MICHALCZYK, Michael, Joseph
16 Servan Court
Wilmington, DE 19805 / US
04 / TAKAHASHI, Tatsuhiro
Ohba-cho, Aoba-ku, Yokohama-shi
Kanagawa 225 / JP
[1999/27]
Representative(s)Matthews, Derek Peter , et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/27]Matthews, Derek Peter , et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date97941030.511.09.1997
[1999/27]
WO1997US16070
Priority number, dateUS19960026023P13.09.1996         Original published format: US 26023 P
US1997092921609.09.1997         Original published format: US 929216
[1999/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9811114
Date:19.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0927185
Date:07.07.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.1998
[1999/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0927185
Date:14.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.03.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07F9/14, C07F9/09, C07F9/113, C07F9/146, C08F30/02
[1999/27]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1999/27]
TitleGerman:PHOSPHOR-ENTHALTENDE FLUOROMONOMERE UND POLYMERE DAVON[2002/14]
English:PHOSPHORUS-CONTAINING FLUOROMONOMERS AND POLYMERS THEREOF[1999/27]
French:FLUOROMONOMERES CONTENANT DU PHOSPHORE ET LEURS POLYMERES[2002/12]
Former [1999/27]POSPHOR-ENTHALTENDE FLUOROMONOMERE UND POLYMERE DAVON
Former [1999/27]FLUOROMONOMERES A TENEUR EN PHOSPHORE ET LEURS POLYMERES
Entry into regional phase19.02.1999National basic fee paid 
19.02.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
19.02.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.03.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.02.1999Examination requested  [1999/27]
13.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
22.10.2002Date of oral proceedings
22.11.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
22.11.2002Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
29.09.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.01.2006Fee for grant paid
09.01.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination23.01.2003Appeal received No.  T0412/03
02.04.2003Statement of grounds filed
16.06.2005Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
16.06.2005Date of oral proceedings
24.06.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Opposition(s)15.08.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
11.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
12.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL14.11.2007
[2008/25]
Cited inInternational search[A]FR2126206  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-19 * claim 15 *;
 [A]US5081287  (PEAKE CLINTON J [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [DA]US4138426  (ENGLAND DAVID C) [DA] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [DA]WO9111420  (DU PONT [US]) [DA] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4176215  (MOLNAR CHARLES J [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [PA]  - S.D. PEDERSEN, "The synthesis of phosphonate ester containing fluorinated vinyl ethers", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY., EASTON US, (1996), vol. 61, no. 23, pages 8024 - 8031, XP002047183 [PA] 1-19 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo961086a