Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0927185 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0927185



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 863
10.04.2015 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
17.09.2008 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
18.10.2007 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
10.08.2007 General enquiry Search / examination 1
20.04.2007 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
20.04.2007 Priority document Search / examination 34
04.04.2007 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
04.04.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 25
09.03.2007 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
09.03.2007 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
13.02.2007 General enquiry Search / examination 1
10.11.2006 General enquiry Search / examination 1
16.08.2006 General enquiry Search / examination 1
15.03.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
10.02.2006 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
10.02.2006 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
10.02.2006 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
09.02.2006 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
09.02.2006 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
09.02.2006 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
09.02.2006 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
29.09.2005 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
29.09.2005 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
29.09.2005 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 6
29.09.2005 Text intended for grant Search / examination 29
23.09.2005 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
13.09.2005 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 3
09.09.2005 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
25.07.2005 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
25.07.2005 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 20
24.06.2005 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 7
16.06.2005 Communication (no form) Appeal 19
16.06.2005 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 6
16.06.2005 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
31.05.2005 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
18.05.2005 Claims Appeal 3
18.05.2005 Claims Appeal 3
18.05.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
18.05.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
18.05.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
16.05.2005 Claims Appeal 1
16.05.2005 Claims Appeal 1
16.05.2005 Claims Appeal 2
16.05.2005 Claims Appeal 2
16.05.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
16.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Appeal 2
16.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Appeal 4
16.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Appeal 7
22.03.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.03.2005 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
03.03.2005 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 3
08.05.2003 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
08.05.2003 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
30.04.2003 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
30.04.2003 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
30.04.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
30.04.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
30.04.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
30.04.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.04.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
30.04.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.04.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.04.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.04.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
14.04.2003 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
14.04.2003 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
10.04.2003 Processing of an appeal Search / examination 1
03.04.2003 Annex Appeal 1
03.04.2003 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
03.04.2003 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 18
03.04.2003 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 17
03.04.2003 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 5
03.04.2003 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 37
03.04.2003 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 16
03.04.2003 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 7
03.04.2003 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 6
03.04.2003 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 7
03.04.2003 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 2
02.04.2003 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 3
24.01.2003 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
24.01.2003 Notice of appeal/statement of grounds Search / examination 1
23.01.2003 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
26.11.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
22.11.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
22.11.2002 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 6
22.11.2002 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
22.11.2002 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 3
22.11.2002 Means of redress Search / examination 1
22.11.2002 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
22.11.2002 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
22.11.2002 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 5
24.10.2002 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
24.10.2002 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 3
24.10.2002 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
21.10.2002 Claims Search / examination 1
21.10.2002 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
21.10.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
17.10.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 2
17.10.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Search / examination 2
20.09.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 2
12.09.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
05.09.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
05.09.2002 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
05.09.2002 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
02.09.2002 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
23.08.2002 Annex Search / examination 7
23.08.2002 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
05.08.2002 Claims Search / examination 1
05.08.2002 Description Search / examination 2
05.08.2002 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
23.07.2002 Grant of extension of time limit Search / examination 1
16.07.2002 Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant Search / examination 1
15.07.2002 Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant Search / examination 2
05.03.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
05.03.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
05.03.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
05.03.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 30
15.02.2002 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
02.01.2002 Claims Search / examination 1
02.01.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.12.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
26.10.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
22.10.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.10.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.07.2001 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
25.06.2001 Request for change of name Search / examination 1
13.06.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
13.06.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.06.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.03.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 3
29.03.1999 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
23.02.1999 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
19.02.1999 Annex Search / examination 36
19.02.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
27.11.1998 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
20.05.1998 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
19.03.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
19.03.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 32
19.03.1998 Priority document Search / examination 24
11.09.1997 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
11.09.1997 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 20
11.09.1997 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
11.09.1997 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 38
11.09.1997 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 10
11.09.1997 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 18
11.09.1997 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 16
11.09.1997 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 30
11.09.1997 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 18
11.09.1997 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
11.09.1997 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
11.09.1997 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
11.09.1997 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
11.09.1997 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 32