EP0888685 - CHARGE COUPLED IMAGING DEVICE, AND METHOD OF OPERATING SUCH A DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DALSA CORPORATION 605 McMurray Road Waterloo, Ontario N2V 2E9 / CA | [2002/51] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROKS, Edwin Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
BOSIERS, Jan, Theodoor, Jozef Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
KORTHOUT, Alouisius, Whilhelmus, Marinus Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
OPMEER, Peter Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Smeets, Eugenius Theodorus J. M., et al c/o Octrooibureau Smeets Poelhekkelaan 16 5644 TN Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | Smeets, Eugenius Theodorus J. M., et al c/o Octrooibureau Smeets, Poelhekkelaan 16 5644 TN Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2001/15] | Duijvestijn, Adrianus Johannes, et al Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1999/01] | Houbiers, Ernest Emile Marie Gerlach, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 97941141.0 | 02.10.1997 | [1999/01] | WO1997IB01201 | Priority number, date | EP19960202755 | 03.10.1996 Original published format: EP 96202755 | EP19970202189 | 15.07.1997 Original published format: EP 97202189 | [1999/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9817051 | Date: | 23.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0888685 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0888685 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04N3/15, H04N5/335, H01L27/148 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
H04N25/445 (EP,US);
H04N25/73 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1999/01] | Title | German: | LADUNGSGEKOPPELTE BILDAUFNAHMEANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BETÄTIGUNG EINER DERARTIGEN ANORDNUNG | [2004/19] | English: | CHARGE COUPLED IMAGING DEVICE, AND METHOD OF OPERATING SUCH A DEVICE | [1999/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE A COUPLAGE DE CHARGE ET PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT DE CE DISPOSITIF | [1999/01] |
Former [1999/01] | LADUNGSGEKOPPELTE BILDAUFNAHEMANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BETÄTIGUNG EINER DERARTIGEN ANORDNUNG | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/04] | 05.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 29.12.2004 | NL | 29.12.2004 | [2006/32] |
Former [2006/14] | NL | 29.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4951148 (ESSER LEONARD J M [NL], et al); | [A]US5317408 (HIROTA ISAO [JP]); | [A]EP0720388 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | [A]WO9626546 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [AP]WO9701238 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES, Volume 38, No. 5, May 1991, JAN T. BOSIERS et al., "A 2/3-in 1187(H) x 581 (V) S-VHS-Compatible Frame-Transfer CCD for ESP and Movie Mode". |