EP0871954 - HOLOGRAPHIC SECURITY SYSTEM FOR OPTICAL DISCS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WEA Manufacturing, Inc. 1444 East Lackawanna Avenue, P.O. Box 321 Olyphant, PA 18447 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/43] | For all designated states Wea Manufacturing Inc. 1444 East Lackawanna Avenue, P.O. Box 321 Olyphant, PA 18447 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUHAN, John, M. 224 Second Street Blakely, PA 18447 / US | [1998/43] | Representative(s) | Lewin, John Harvey Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/43] | Lewin, John Harvey Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 97941165.9 | 05.09.1997 | [1998/43] | WO1997IB01228 | Priority number, date | US19960708456 | 05.09.1996 Original published format: US 708456 | [1998/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9812703 | Date: | 26.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0871954 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0871954 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.10.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G11B23/28, G11B23/40 | [2000/48] | CPC: |
G11B23/284 (EP,US);
G11B19/00 (EP,US);
G11B23/281 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/43] | G11B7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/43] | Title | German: | HOLOGRAPHISCHES SICHERHEITSSYSTEM FÜR OPTISCHE PLATTEN | [1998/43] | English: | HOLOGRAPHIC SECURITY SYSTEM FOR OPTICAL DISCS | [1998/43] | French: | SYSTEME DE SECURITE HOLOGRAPHIQUE POUR DISQUES OPTIQUES | [1998/43] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.1998 | Search fee paid | 05.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/43] | 11.04.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.04.2001 | Request for decision received: (all rights) | 13.06.2001 | Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request granted | 27.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.11.2002 | BE | 13.11.2002 | CH | 13.11.2002 | FI | 13.11.2002 | GR | 13.11.2002 | LI | 13.11.2002 | NL | 13.11.2002 | DK | 13.02.2003 | PT | 13.02.2003 | SE | 13.02.2003 | ES | 29.05.2003 | [2007/17] |
Former [2004/04] | AT | 13.11.2002 | |
BE | 13.11.2002 | ||
CH | 13.11.2002 | ||
FI | 13.11.2002 | ||
GR | 13.11.2002 | ||
LI | 13.11.2002 | ||
NL | 13.11.2002 | ||
PT | 13.02.2003 | ||
SE | 13.02.2003 | ||
ES | 29.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/51] | AT | 13.11.2002 | |
BE | 13.11.2002 | ||
CH | 13.11.2002 | ||
FI | 13.11.2002 | ||
GR | 13.11.2002 | ||
LI | 13.11.2002 | ||
NL | 13.11.2002 | ||
PT | 13.02.2003 | ||
SE | 13.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | AT | 13.11.2002 | |
CH | 13.11.2002 | ||
FI | 13.11.2002 | ||
GR | 13.11.2002 | ||
LI | 13.11.2002 | ||
NL | 13.11.2002 | ||
PT | 13.02.2003 | ||
SE | 13.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/39] | AT | 13.11.2002 | |
CH | 13.11.2002 | ||
GR | 13.11.2002 | ||
LI | 13.11.2002 | ||
NL | 13.11.2002 | ||
PT | 13.02.2003 | ||
SE | 13.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 13.11.2002 | |
GR | 13.11.2002 | ||
NL | 13.11.2002 | ||
PT | 13.02.2003 | ||
SE | 13.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 13.11.2002 | |
NL | 13.11.2002 | ||
PT | 13.02.2003 | ||
SE | 13.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 13.11.2002 | |
PT | 13.02.2003 | ||
SE | 13.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 13.02.2003 | |
SE | 13.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/19] | SE | 13.02.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3331248 (POLYGRAM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3515602 (POLYGRAM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0643391 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3* abstract * | International search | [A]US5549953 (LI LI [CA]); | [AP]US5587984 (OWA HIDEO [JP], et al); | [AP]US5608717 (ITO TAMOTSU [JP], et al) |