Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969612

EP0969612 - MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.03.2014
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.04.2014  [2014/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[2006/18]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo-to, 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / UCHIDA, Yoshinori Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki
Kaisha 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP
02 / FUJIO, Hiroyuki Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Bohnenberger, Johannes , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Bohnenberger, Johannes , et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Former [2000/01]Bohnenberger, Johannes, Dr. , et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date97941288.930.09.1997
[2000/01]
WO1997JP03492
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9917469
Date:08.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969612
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.1999
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP08.04.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.03.2006
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/26
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:MOBILES ÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM[2000/01]
English:MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2000/01]
French:SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase28.05.1999Translation filed 
28.05.1999National basic fee paid 
28.05.1999Search fee paid 
28.05.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
28.05.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.05.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
14.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.11.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/15]
04.12.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2014/15]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.12.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
25.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
29.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
27.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
28.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
29.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
26.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 12
29.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 13
28.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 14
29.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 15
27.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 16
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201317   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0777395  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al) [A] 1-25 * abstract * * column 4, line 41 - line 45 *;
 [A]US5586119  (SCRIBANO GINO A [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * column 3, line 60 - line 67 * * column 4, line 53 - line 62 *;
 [A]EP0522774  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1-25 * column 35, line 58 - column 36, line 29 *;
 [A]US5583859  (FELDMEIER DAVID C [US]) [A] 1-25 * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 5 *;
 [X]EP0738091  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 26-32 * abstract * * column 1, line 16 - line 22 * * column 5, line 5 - line 11 *;
 [X]WO9612380  (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 26-32 * abstract * * page 16, line 16 - line 36 * * page 17, line 18 - line 29 *;
 [A]WO9508897  (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [A] 26-32 * abstract * * page 20, line 4 - line 21 *;
 [A]EP0421535  (NEDERLAND PTT [NL]) [A] 26-32 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9636191  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 26-32 * abstract * * page 9, line 10 - line 21 * * page 10, line 25 - page 11, line 13 *;
 [A]EP0577960  (ROKE MANOR RESEARCH [GB]) [A] 26-32 * abstract *
International search[Y]JPH08130766  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP);
 [Y]JPS61288697  (FUJITSU LTD, et al);
 [A]JPH06169484  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE);
 [A]JPH09186704  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD, et al)