Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1000397

EP1000397 - PRODUCING A MIRRORED DATA COPY (IMAGE) USING REFERENCE LABELS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.07.2005
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 20.02.2008  [2008/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MARATHON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
1300 Massachusetts Avenue
Boxboro, MA 01719 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/20]For all designated states
Marathon Technologies Corporation
1300 Massachusetts Avenue
Boxboro, MA 01719 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FITZGERALD, Martin, J., V.
5 Holbrook Street
Medway, MA 02053 / US
02 / TREMBLAY, Glenn, A.
139 South Street
Upton, MA 01568 / US
[2000/20]
Representative(s)Jones, David Colin , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/20]Jones, David Colin , et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date97941564.316.09.1997
[2000/20]
WO1997US16206
Priority number, dateUS1996071425517.09.1996         Original published format: US 714255
[2000/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9812642
Date:26.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1000397
Date:17.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.1998
[2000/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1000397
Date:25.08.2004
Language:EN
[2004/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.03.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/00, G06F11/20
[2000/41]
Former International [2000/20]G06F13/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/20]
TitleGerman:ERZEUGUNG EINER SPIEGELDATENKOPIE (BILD) UNTER VERWENDUNG VON REFERENZETIKETTEN[2003/48]
English:PRODUCING A MIRRORED DATA COPY (IMAGE) USING REFERENCE LABELS[2000/20]
French:PRODUCTION D'UNE COPIE DE DONNEES (IMAGE) MIROIR A L'AIDE DE LABELS DE REFERENCE[2000/20]
Former [2000/20]ERZEUGUNG EINER SPIEGELDATENKOPIE (BILD) UNTER VERWENDUNG VAN REFERENZETIKETTEN
Entry into regional phase15.04.1999National basic fee paid 
15.04.1999Search fee paid 
15.04.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
15.04.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.04.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
15.04.1999Examination requested  [2000/20]
06.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.05.2004Fee for grant paid
28.05.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.05.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
04.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
24.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
23.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR25.08.2004
IT25.08.2004
NL25.08.2004
SE25.11.2004
[2008/08]
Former [2006/32]FR25.08.2004
NL25.08.2004
SE25.11.2004
Former [2006/14]NL25.08.2004
SE25.11.2004
Former [2005/10]SE25.11.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0672984  (IBM [US]) [X] 1-3,13-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5307481  (SHIMAZAKI HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,13 * column 13, line 40 - column 16, line 15; figures 22-29 *;
 [A]FR2649222  (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,13 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0672985  (IBM [US]) [A] 1-23 * column 3, line 3 - column 4, line 11 *;
 [A]EP0617362  (IBM [US]) [A] 1-23 * abstract *
International search[X]US5544347  (YANAI MOSHE [US], et al);
 [Y]US5390313  (YANAI MOSHE [US], et al);
 [Y]US5633999  (CLOWES RICHARD F [US], et al);
 [Y]US5487160  (BEMIS EDWARD D [US]);
 [AP]US5623595  (BAILEY WILLIAM [US]);
 [AP]US5588110  (DEKONING RODNEY A [US], et al)