Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0946689

EP0946689 - ANTIOXIDANTS AND ANTIOXIDANT BOOSTERS CAPABLE OF PRODUCING HYDROPEROXYL RADICALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.08.2003
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900
Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900
Annandale NJ 08801-0900 / US
Former [2001/01]For all designated states
ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
1545 Route 22 East, Clinton Township
Annandale, New Jersey 08801 / US
Former [1999/40]For all designated states
EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY
P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue
Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ALDRICH, Haven, S.
10 Dartmouth
Annandale, NJ 08801 / US
02 / SCHLOSBERG, Richard, H.
800 Amsterdam Road
Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US
03 / BROIS, Stanley, J.
773 Lamberts Mill Road
Westfield, NJ 07090 / US
[1999/40]
Representative(s)Dew, Melvyn John , et al
ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc.
IP Law Europe
Hermeslaan 2
1831 Machelen / BE
[N/P]
Former [2001/05]Dew, Melvyn John , et al
ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. Law Technology P.O.Box 105
1830 Machelen / BE
Former [1999/40]Fletcher Watts, Susan J. , et al
ESSO Engineering (Europe) Limited, Patents and Licences, Mailpoint 72, Esso House, Ermyn Way
Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB
Application number, filing date97941625.211.09.1997
[1999/40]
WO1997US16332
Priority number, dateUS1996071342013.09.1996         Original published format: US 713420
[1999/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9811181
Date:19.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0946689
Date:06.10.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.1998
[1999/40]
Search report(s)International search reportUS19.03.1998
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP10.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:C10M105/40, C10M129/76, C10M133/16, C10M133/48, C10M129/26, C10M159/12, C09K15/06, C09K15/22, C09K15/30, C09K15/32, // (C10M159/12, 129:24, 129:28, 129:48, 133:08),(C10N10/02, 10:06, 10:08, 10:16)
[2000/47]
Former International [1999/40]C10M133/00, C10M133/08, C10M133/16, C10M133/22, C10M129/70, C07D345/00, C07D293/00, C07C69/00, C07C61/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL [1999/40]
TitleGerman:ANTIOXIDANTIEN UND ANTIOXIDANTIONSVERSTÄRKER ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON HYDROPEROXIDRADIKALEN FÄHIGE[1999/40]
English:ANTIOXIDANTS AND ANTIOXIDANT BOOSTERS CAPABLE OF PRODUCING HYDROPEROXYL RADICALS[1999/40]
French:ANTI-OXYDANTS ET RENFOR ATEURS D'ANTI-OXYDANTS CAPABLES DE PRODUIRE DES RADICAUX D'HYDROPEROXYLE[1999/40]
Entry into regional phase01.04.1999National basic fee paid 
01.04.1999Search fee paid 
01.04.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
01.04.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.04.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
01.04.1999Examination requested  [1999/40]
13.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/41]
07.05.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200206   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0612832  (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) [X] 1-3,8,10,12,13 * claim 1; table 1 *;
 [XP]WO9628525  (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [XP] 1-3,8,10,12,13 * figure 1; tables 1-7,13 *;
 [XP]WO9711140  (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [XP] 1-3,8,10,12,13 * tables 6-9 *;
 [E]WO9811179  (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [E] 1-3,8,10,12,13 * claim 1; tables 1,5,10,11 *
International search[X]US4125518  (SUSI PETER V);
 [X]US4116643  (RYER JACK, et al);
 [X]US4849123  (TIPTON CRAIG D [US], et al);
 [X]US5114603  (KENNEDY STEVEN [US], et al);
 [X]JPH0586001  (KAO CORP);
 [X]JPH0578294  (KAO CORP);
 [X]DE2617680  (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO);
 [X]BR7904998  (UNIROYAL INC)