Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993395

EP0993395 - CURRENT MEASUREMENT MODULE FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE STARTER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.10.2003
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.11.2003  [2003/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/16]
Inventor(s)01 / KRAMER, Claus
Newton-Abbot-Strasse 26
D-74354 Besigheim / DE
02 / SCHMIDT, Karl-Otto
Sommerbergstrasse 14
D-75210 Keltern / DE
03 / HUBER, Elmar
Unter dem Pflinzhöck 19a
D-99819 Eisenach / DE
04 / DAURER, Uwe
Alt-Wuerttemberg-Allee 21
D-71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
[2000/16]
Application number, filing date97941788.812.08.1997
[2000/16]
WO1997DE01713
Priority number, dateDE199713063517.07.1997         Original published format: DE 19730635
[2000/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9903709
Date:28.01.1999
Language:DE
[1999/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993395
Date:19.04.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.1999
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993395
Date:27.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60R16/02
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2000/16]
TitleGerman:STROMMESSMODUL FÜR EINE STARTEINRICHTUNG VON BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN[2000/16]
English:CURRENT MEASUREMENT MODULE FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE STARTER DEVICE[2000/16]
French:MODULE DE MESURE DE COURANT POUR UN DISPOSITIF DE DEMARRAGE DE MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE[2000/16]
Entry into regional phase17.02.2000National basic fee paid 
17.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
17.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.05.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/16]
08.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.2002Fee for grant paid
30.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
02.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[YA]DE19503537  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-4 * column 2, line 24 - line 37; figures 1-7 * [A] 5-11;
 [Y]CH676646  (LANDIS & GYR BETRIEBS AG) [Y] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0562457  (MAGNETI MARELLI SPA [IT]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5467008  (UCHINAMI MASANOBU [JP]) [A] 1,2 * column W *