Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0864754

EP0864754 - OIL SEPARATOR FOR COMPRESSORS, SCROLL COMPRESSOR USING SAME, AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING OIL SEPARATOR FOR COMPRESSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.10.2003
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.12.2003  [2003/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LIMITED
Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 530 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/38]For all designated states
DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LIMITED
Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / NAKAJIMA, Hideyuki, c/o Rinkai Factory of
Sakai Plant of DAIKIN INDUSTRIES; LTD.
12, Chikkoushinmachi3-cho, Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP
02 / KITAURA, Hiroshi, c/o Rinkai Factory of
Sakai Plant of DAIKIN INDUSTRIES; LTD.
12, Chikkoushinmachi3-cho, Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP
03 / SAKATA, Yuji, c/o Rinkai Factory of
Sakai Plant of DAIKIN INDUSTRIES; LTD.
12, Chikkoushinmachi3-cho, Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP
 [2002/15]
Former [1998/38]01 / NAKAJIMA, Hideyuki, Daikin Industries Ltd
12, Chikkou-shinmachi 3-chome
Sakai-shi Osaka 592 / JP
02 / KITAURA, Hiroshi, Daikin Industries Ltd
12 Chikkou-shinmachi 3-chome
Sakai-shi Osaka 592 / JP
03 / SAKATA, Yuji, Daikin Industries Ltd
12 Chikkou-shinmachi 3-chome
Sakai-shi Osaka 592 / JP
Representative(s)Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Elsenheimerstrasse 49
80687 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/20]GROSSE BOCKHORNI SCHUMACHER
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Forstenrieder Allee 59
81476 München / DE
Former [1998/38]Grosse, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl Grosse - Bockhorni & Partner, Forstenrieder Allee 59
81476 München / DE
Application number, filing date97942192.224.09.1997
[1998/38]
WO1997JP03370
Priority number, dateJP1996028033530.09.1996         Original published format: JP 28033596
[1998/38]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9814705
Date:09.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0864754
Date:16.09.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.1998
[1998/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0864754
Date:11.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP09.04.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:F04C29/02, B01D17/04, B01D45/08, B01D17/022
[2000/38]
Former International [1998/38]F04C29/02
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1998/38]
TitleGerman:ÖLABSCHEIDER FÜR VERDICHTERN, SPIRALVERDICHTER MIT EINEM SOLCHEN ÖLABSCHEIDER SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ÖLABSCHEIDERS FÜR VERDICHTERN[2002/50]
English:OIL SEPARATOR FOR COMPRESSORS, SCROLL COMPRESSOR USING SAME, AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING OIL SEPARATOR FOR COMPRESSORS[1998/38]
French:SEPARATEUR D'HUILE POUR COMPRESSEURS, COMPRESSEUR A VOLUTES UTILISANT LEDIT SEPARATEUR, ET PROCEDE POUR FABRIQUER UN SEPARATEUR D'HUILE POUR COMPRESSEURS[1998/38]
Former [1998/38]ÖLABSCHEIDER FÜR VERDICHTER, SPIRALVERDICHTER MIT EINEM SOLCHEN ÖLABSCHEIDER SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ÖLABSCHEIDER FÜR SPIRALVERDICHTERN
Entry into regional phase23.06.1998Translation filed 
23.06.1998National basic fee paid 
23.06.1998Search fee paid 
23.06.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
23.06.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.06.1998Examination requested  [1998/38]
02.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.04.2002Fee for grant paid
17.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
22.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
28.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
25.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search   [] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]JPH07293475  (SEIKO SEIKI KK);
 [A]JPH01240787  (DAIKIN IND LTD)