Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1015897

EP1015897 - UTILITY METER PROVIDING AN INTERFACE BETWEEN A DIGITAL NETWORK AND HOME ELECTRONICS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.05.2004
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2009Change - representativepublished on 09.09.2009  [2009/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E.J. Barkuloo Trust
16th Floor, 817 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY 10021 / US
[2000/27]
Inventor(s)01 / ROOS, Charles, E.
2507 Ridgewood Drive
Nashville, TN 37215 / US
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Franks, Robert Benjamin , et al
Franks & Co Limited
15 Jessops Riverside
Brightside Lane
Sheffield S9 2RX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/37]Franks, Robert Benjamin , et al
Franks & Co Limited 15 Jessops Riverside Brightside Lane
Sheffield S9 2RX / GB
Former [2000/27]Franks, Robert Benjamin , et al
Franks & Co., 352 Omega Court, Cemetery Road
Sheffield S11 8FT / GB
Application number, filing date97942513.917.09.1997
[2000/27]
WO1997US16426
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9914606
Date:25.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1015897
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.1999
[2000/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01R21/133, G01D4/00
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/27]
TitleGerman:VERBRAUCHSZÄHLER MIT SCHNITTSTELLE ZWISCHEN DIGITALEM NETZ UND ELEKTRONISCHER HAUSHALTSAPPARATUR[2000/27]
English:UTILITY METER PROVIDING AN INTERFACE BETWEEN A DIGITAL NETWORK AND HOME ELECTRONICS[2000/27]
French:COMPTEUR DE FOURNITURES DE SERVICES PUBLICS ASSURANT UNE INTERFACE ENTRE UN RESEAU NUMERIQUE ET UNE INSTALLATION ELECTRONIQUE DOMESTIQUE[2000/27]
Entry into regional phase13.04.2000National basic fee paid 
13.04.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
13.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
13.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/27]
12.09.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
25.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.11.2002Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No
03.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.12.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/26]
26.01.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
04.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
24.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
23.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
17.04.200003   M06   Fee paid on   17.10.2000
30.09.200307   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[E]US5699276  (ROOS CHARLES E [US]) [E] 1-37 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9709800  (OPEN SYSTEMS COMMUNICATIONS MA [US]) [A] 1,12,19,21,32,35 * abstract * * page 4, line 1 - line 7 * * page 9, line 11 - line 16 * * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]GB2297663  (GEN ELECTRIC CO PLC [GB]) [A] 1,12,19,21,32,35 * abstract * * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 14 * * figure 2 *;
 [PA]EP0795948  (FIRST PACIFIC NETWORKS INC [US]) [PA] 1,12,19,21,32,35 * abstract * * page 3, line 10 - line 20 * * figures 2,3 *;
 [DA]US5101191  (MACFADYEN DAVID J [US], et al) [DA] 1,12,21,32,35 * abstract * * column 1, line 50 - line 62 * * column 2, line 22 - line 27 * * figures 2,3B *;
 [AD]US4332980  (REYNOLDS CHRISTOPHER C, et al) [AD] 1,12,19,21,32,35 * abstract * * column 2, line 44 - line 66 * * figures 1,6 *