Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1007246

EP1007246 - CONTINUOUS CASTING MOULD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.12.2002
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.01.2003  [2003/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMS Demag AG
Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
[2000/24]
Inventor(s)01 / PLESCHIUTSCHNIGG, Fritz-Peter
Reiserweg 69
D-47269 Duisburg / DE
[2000/24]
Representative(s)Valentin, Ekkehard , et al
Patentanwälte
Hemmerich, Valentin, Gihske, Grosse
Hammerstrasse 2
57072 Siegen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/24]Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Hemmerich, Valentin, Gihske, Grosse, Hammerstrasse 2
57072 Siegen / DE
Application number, filing date97942954.520.09.1997
[2000/24]
WO1997EP05164
Priority number, dateDE199613929525.09.1996         Original published format: DE 19639295
[2000/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9813157
Date:02.04.1998
Language:DE
[1998/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1007246
Date:14.06.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.1998
[2000/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1007246
Date:06.02.2002
Language:DE
[2002/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.04.1998
ClassificationInternational:B22D11/04
[2000/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/24]
TitleGerman:STRANGGIESSKOKILLE[2000/24]
English:CONTINUOUS CASTING MOULD[2000/24]
French:COQUILLE POUR LA COULEE EN CONTINU[2000/24]
Entry into regional phase24.03.1999National basic fee paid 
24.03.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
24.03.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.03.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.03.1999Examination requested  [2000/24]
24.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.11.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.08.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.2001Fee for grant paid
06.11.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.11.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
18.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[E]WO9743063  (KM EUROPA METAL AG [DE], et al) [E] 1,5,11-13 * page 4, line 18 - page 6, line 9; figure 4 *;
 [X]FR1282943  (BRITISH IRON STEEL RESEARCH) [X] 1,4,5,13 * the whole document *;
 [X]FR2112384  (USS ENG & CONSULT) [X] 1,4,5,13 * page 2, line 17 - page 3, line 36; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]JPS61176444  ;
 [X]JPS6033854  ;
 [X]WO9521036  (SMS CONCAST INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3-9,11-13 * figures 1-14 *;
 [A]EP0149734  (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]) [A] 2 * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US3837391  (ROSSI I) [A] 3 * column 7, line 41 - line 61; figures 7,8 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861225), vol. 010, no. 388, Database accession no. (M - 549), [X] 1,4,5 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850703), vol. 009, no. 158, Database accession no. (M - 393), [X] 1,5 * abstract *