Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973588

EP0973588 - PSYCHOLOGICAL STIMULATING TOY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.01.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sypkov, Sergei Vladimirovich
Krylova Street, 42-21
Karaganda, 470076 / KZ
[2000/04]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Beetz & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date97943214.302.10.1997
[2000/04]
WO1997KZ00005
Priority number, dateKZ1997000010304.02.1997         Original published format: KZ 970103
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9833567
Date:06.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973588
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.1998
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973588
Date:27.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.08.1998
ClassificationInternational:A63F9/08
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:PSYCHOLOGISCH STIMULIERENDES SPIELZEUG[2000/04]
English:PSYCHOLOGICAL STIMULATING TOY[2000/04]
French:JOUET DE STIMULATION PSYCHOLOGIQUE[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase27.08.1999National basic fee paid 
27.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
27.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.10.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
29.09.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
29.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.08.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
07.09.2001Fee for grant paid
07.09.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)30.12.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
30.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR27.03.2002
SE27.06.2002
[2006/14]
Former [2002/37]SE27.06.2002
Cited inInternational search[X]US4104809  (DAY FREDERICK A, et al) [X] 1,2 * see abstract;; figure 1 *;
 [X]US3826549  (SCHOLFIELD R) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 58; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]WO9400207  (TIMES THREE PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1,2 * page 7, line 25 - page 8, line 4; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4667961  (ABU-SHUMAYS IBRAHIM K [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * see abstract;; figure 3 *;
 [A]GB2296873  (JORDAN GASTON ORLANDO [GB]) [A] 1,2 * figure 1; claim 1 *