Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1018079

EP1018079 - NAVIGATION SYSTEM WITH VEHICLE SERVICE INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.07.2007
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB, IT
published on 20.02.2008  [2008/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Magellan Dis Inc.
2950 Waterview
Rochester Hills, MI 48309 / US
[2000/28]
Inventor(s)01 / DEGRAAF, Brent, L.
1482 Marlowe Street
Canton, MI 48187 / US
[2000/28]
Representative(s)Shanks, Andrew , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Aurora
120 Bothwell Street
Glasgow G2 7JS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]Shanks, Andrew , et al
Cruikshank & Fairweather, 19 Royal Exchange Square
Glasgow G1 3AE / GB
Application number, filing date97943356.217.09.1997
[2000/28]
WO1997US16552
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9914684
Date:25.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1018079
Date:12.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.1999
[2000/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1018079
Date:06.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/36]
Search report(s)International search reportUS25.03.1999
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP18.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06F15/00, G06G7/70, G06G7/76, G06G7/78, G01C22/02, G07C5/00, B60R16/02
[2001/05]
Former International [2000/28]G06F15/00, G06G7/70, G06G7/76, G06G7/78
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/28]
TitleGerman:NAVIGATIONSSYSTEM MIT FAHRZEUGSERVICEINFORMATION[2000/28]
English:NAVIGATION SYSTEM WITH VEHICLE SERVICE INFORMATION[2000/28]
French:SYSTEME DE NAVIGATION AFFICHANT DES INFORMATIONS RELATIVES A L'ENTRETIEN D'UN VEHICULE[2000/28]
Entry into regional phase15.03.2000National basic fee paid 
15.03.2000Search fee paid 
15.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
15.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
15.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/28]
13.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
18.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.2006Fee for grant paid
24.07.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.06.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
28.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
03     Fee paid on   28.03.2000
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.09.2006
BE06.09.2006
CH06.09.2006
FI06.09.2006
IT06.09.2006
LI06.09.2006
NL06.09.2006
GB06.12.2006
SE06.12.2006
ES17.12.2006
[2008/08]
Former [2007/29]AT06.09.2006
BE06.09.2006
CH06.09.2006
FI06.09.2006
LI06.09.2006
NL06.09.2006
SE06.12.2006
ES17.12.2006
Former [2007/21]CH06.09.2006
FI06.09.2006
LI06.09.2006
NL06.09.2006
SE06.12.2006
ES17.12.2006
Former [2007/17]CH06.09.2006
FI06.09.2006
LI06.09.2006
SE06.12.2006
ES17.12.2006
Documents cited:Search[XY]JPH09115097  ;
 [Y]US4501005  (MILLER ALBERT J [US]) [Y] 4,12 * abstract * * column 3, line 14 - line 18 *;
 [Y]DE3828224  (KLEEN BEREND DIPL ING [DE], et al) [Y] 18 * column 1, line 16 - line 26 *
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970930), vol. 1997, no. 09, [X] 1-3,6,7,10,11,13-16 * abstract * [Y] 4,12,18
International search[Y]US4244514  (NOMURA HIROYUKI, et al);
 [Y]US5243528  (LEFEBVRE REBECCA K [US]);
 [X]US5359527  (TAKANABE NAOKO [JP], et al);
 [Y]US5359529  (SNIDER PETER [US]);
 [Y]US5406492  (SUZUKI SEIICHI [JP]);
 [Y]US5410485  (ICHIKAWA SHIGERU [JP]);
 [X]US5508931  (SNIDER PETER [US]);
 [Y]US5612882  (LEFEBVRE REBECCA K [US], et al)