Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976244

EP0976244 - METHOD FOR COLLATING DATA FROM MULTIPLE SOURCES TO FORM A COMPOSITE PROGRAM GUIDE FOR DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/05]SYSTEM FOR COLLATING DATA FROM MULTIPLE SOURCES TO FORM A COMPOSITE PROGRAM GUIDE FOR DISPLAY
[2007/17]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  20.03.2017
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.03.2017Refusal of applicationpublished on 19.04.2017  [2017/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Technicolor USA, Inc.
101 West 103rd Street
Indianapolis, IN 46290 / US
[2017/07]
Former [2004/45]For all designated states
Thomson Inc.
10330 North Meridian St.
Indianapolis, IN 46290-1024 / US
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC.
10330 North Meridian St
Indianapolis, IN 46290-1024 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WEHMEYER, Keith, Reynolds
6411 Columbia Circle
Fishers, IN 46038 / US
02 / LOGAN, Robert, Joseph
4302 Sagamore Trail
Indianapolis, IN 46220 / US
03 / COMER, Robert, Skipworth
103 East 106th Street
Indianapolis, IN 46280 / US
04 / CROSBY, Sheila, Renee
325 Hampton Court
Crystal Lake, IL 60012 / US
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Huchet, Anne
TECHNICOLOR
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Kohrs, Martin
Thomson multimedia 46, quai A. Le Gallo
F-92648 Boulogne-Billancourt Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date97943507.023.09.1997
[2000/05]
WO1997US17031
Priority number, dateUS19970043539P14.04.1997         Original published format: US 43539 P
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9847283
Date:22.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976244
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/173
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/05]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM ORDNEN DER DATEN AUS VERSCHIEDENEN QUELLEN ZUM ZUSAMMENSTELLEN EINER ZUSAMMENGESETZTEN PROGRAMMFÜHRUNG[2007/17]
English:METHOD FOR COLLATING DATA FROM MULTIPLE SOURCES TO FORM A COMPOSITE PROGRAM GUIDE FOR DISPLAY[2007/17]
French:PROCEDE POUR RECUEILLIR DES DONNEES PROVENANT DE MULTIPLES SOURCES POUR FORMER UN GUIDE DES PROGRAMMES COMPOSITES DESTINE A ETRE AFFICHE[2007/17]
Former [2000/05]SYSTEM ZUM ORDNEN DER DATEN AUS VERSCHIEDENEN QUELLEN ZUM ZUSAMMENSTELLEN EINER ZUSAMMENGESETZTEN PROGRAMMFÜHRUNG
Former [2000/05]SYSTEM FOR COLLATING DATA FROM MULTIPLE SOURCES TO FORM A COMPOSITE PROGRAM GUIDE FOR DISPLAY
Former [2000/05]SYSTEME POUR RECUEILLIR DES DONNEES PROVENANT DE MULTIPLES SOURCES POUR FORMER UN GUIDE DES PROGRAMMES COMPOSITES DESTINE A ETRE AFFICHE
Entry into regional phase11.10.1999National basic fee paid 
11.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
11.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
28.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.03.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
11.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2011Date of oral proceedings
03.03.2011Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/16]
03.03.2011Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
26.01.2017Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/16]
Appeal following examination21.04.2011Appeal received No.  T1583/11
01.07.2011Statement of grounds filed
03.05.2016Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2016/19]
13.09.2016Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2016/38]
26.01.2017Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
26.01.2017Date of oral proceedings
31.01.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP04104249.0  / EP1482737
EP04104251.6  / EP1501305
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.07.2003
Request for further processing for:11.05.2004Request for further processing filed
11.05.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
02.06.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
21.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
10.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
16.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
23.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
07.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
22.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
25.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
26.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 12
25.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 13
24.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 14
24.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 15
25.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 16
26.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 17
26.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 18
24.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 19
23.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 20
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.10.199903   M06   Fee paid on   03.01.2000
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9713368  (STARSIGHT TELECAST INC [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * column W *;
 [Y]US5589892  (KNEE ROBERT A [US], et al) [Y] 1-17 * column 9, line 50 - column 13, line 48 * * column 17, line 25 - column 21, line 35 * * column 27, line 21 - column 37, line 51 * * column 43, line 53 - line 55 *;
 [Y]WO9633572  (STARSIGHT TELECAST INC [US]) [Y] 1-17 * page 2, line 9 - page 5, line 19 *;
 [A]WO9609721  (TV GUIDE ON SCREEN [US]) [A] 1-17 * page 7, line 15 - page 12, line 14 *;
 [A]WO9533338  (BELL ATLANTIC NETWORK SERVICES [US]) [A] 1-17 * page 6, line 27 - page 36, line 35 *;
 [A]EP0746119  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * column 9, line 7 - line 35 * * column 30, line 53 - column 31, line 20 * * column 32, line 12 - column 34, line 10 *;
 [PX]WO9728499  (AWARD SOFTWARE INTERNATIONAL I [US]) [PX] 1-17 * column W *;
 [E]WO9741690  (AWARD SOFTWARE INTERNATIONAL I [US]) [E] 1-17 * column W *