Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972043

EP0972043 - HUMAN RANTES MUTANTS INCAPABLE OF AGGREGATE FORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.11.2003
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.01.2004  [2004/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BRITISH BIOTECH PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED
Watlington Road Cowley
Oxford, OX4 5LY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
BRITISH BIOTECH PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED
Watlington Road
Cowley Oxford, OX4 5LY / GB
Inventor(s)01 / CZAPLEWSKI, Lloyd George
British Biotech Pharm. Ltd., Watlington Road
Cowley, Oxford OX4 5LY / GB
02 / HUNTER, Michael George
British Biotech Pharm. Ltd., Watlington Road
Cowley, Oxford OX4 5LY / GB
03 / EDWARDS, Richard Mark
British Biotech Pharm. Ltd., Watlington Road
Cowley, Oxford OX4 5LY / GB
04 / DAWSON, Keith Martyn
British Biotech Pharm. Ltd., Watlington Road
Cowley, Oxford OX4 5LY / GB
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Walls, Alan James , et al
Vernalis (Cambridge) Ltd
Granta Park
Abington
Cambridgeshire CB1 6GB / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Walls, Alan James , et al
British Biotech Pharmaceuticals Ltd, Watlington Road
Cowley, Oxford OX4 5LY / GB
Application number, filing date97943955.124.09.1997
[2000/03]
WO1997GB02605
Priority number, dateUS19960026920P25.09.1996         Original published format: US 26920 P
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9813495
Date:02.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972043
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.1998
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.04.1998
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/19, C12N5/10, C07K14/52, A61K38/19, G01N33/68
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:MUTANTEN VON HUMANEM RANTES, DIE KEINE AGGREGATE BILDEN KÖNNEN[2000/03]
English:HUMAN RANTES MUTANTS INCAPABLE OF AGGREGATE FORMATION[2000/03]
French:MUTANTS DE LA CYTOKINE RANTES HUMAINE INCAPABLES DE FORMER DES AGREGATS[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase10.03.1999National basic fee paid 
10.03.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
10.03.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.04.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.03.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
28.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/01]
14.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
19.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
16.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
02.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200307   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9424285  (CANCER RES CAMPAIGN TECH [GB], et al) [A] 1-8,14 * page 2, paragraph 3 * * page 6, line 18 - line 33 *;
 [A]WO9617935  (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-8,14,19-29 * page 3, line 27 - page 6, line 6 *;
 [A]WO9407521  (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [A] 15-20 * page 9, line 22 - line 36 *
 [XA]  - GONG ET AL., "RANTES and MCP-3 antagonists bind multiple chemokine receptors", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, MD US, (19960503), vol. 271, no. 18, pages 10521 - 10527, XP002047804 [X] 24-26 * page 10525, column L; figure 6 * * page 10525, paragraph L - page 10527 * [A] 1-8,14

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.32.19037
 [A]  - SKELTON ET AL., "Proton NMR assignments and solution conformation of RANTES, a chemokine of the C-C type", BIOCHEMISTRY, EASTON, PA US, (19950425), vol. 34, no. 16, pages 5329 - 5342, XP002054438 [A] 1-8,14 * see page 5337 paragraph bridging columns 1 and 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00016a004
 [A]  - COCCHI ET AL., "Identification of RANTES, MIP-1alpha, and MIP-1ß as the major HIV-suppressive factors produced by CD8+ T cells", SCIENCE, LANCASTER, PA US, (19951215), vol. 270, pages 1811 - 1815, XP000616644 [A] 9-13 * page 1813, column 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.270.5243.1811