Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0876888

EP0876888 - Process for producing water-absorbing resins [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1998/46]METHOD OF PRODUCTION OF WATER-ABSORBING RESIN
[2012/24]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.10.2013
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2013No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.11.2013  [2013/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD.
1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP
[2012/50]
Former [1998/46]For all designated states
Nippon Shokubai Co., Ltd.
1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MIYAKE, Koji
G-402, 931-11, Hamada
Aboshi-ku
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-1242 / JP
02 / MOTONO, Yoshihiro
A-410, Hamada-ryo
931-11, Hamada
Aboshi-ku
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-1242 / JP
03 / HARADA, Nobuyuki
3-1007, 4-41, Yamada-higashi
Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0821 / JP
04 / YANO, Akito
716-1, Yoro, Katsuhara-ku
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-1203 / JP
05 / KANTO, Teruyuki
D-406, Hamada-ryo
931-11, Hamada
Aboshi-ku
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-1242 / JP
06 / SAKAMOTO, Shigeru
A-112, Hamada-ryo
931-11, Hamada
Aboshi-ku
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-1242 / JP
 [2012/42]
Former [1998/46]01 / MIYAKE, Koji
G-402, 931-11, Hamada, Aboshi-ku
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-12 / JP
02 / MOTONO, Yoshihiro
A-410, Hamada-ryo, 931-11, Hamada, Aboshi-ku
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-12 / JP
03 / HARADA, Nobuyuki
3-1007, 4-41, Yamada-higashi
Suita-shi, Osaka 565 / JP
04 / YANO, Akito
716-1, Yoro, Katsuhara-ku
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-12 / JP
05 / KANTO, Teruyuki
D-406, Hamada-ryo, 931-11, Hamada, Aboshi-ku
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-12 / JP
06 / SAKAMOTO, Shigeru
A-112, Hamada-ryo, 931-11, Hamada, Aboshi-ku
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-12 / JP
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/50]Müller - Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Former [2011/02]Müller - Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Former [2008/41]Müller, Frithjof E. , et al
Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Former [1998/46]Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date97944156.516.10.1997
[1998/46]
WO1997JP03753
Priority number, dateJP1996030111524.10.1996         Original published format: JP 30111596
JP1996030111624.10.1996         Original published format: JP 30111696
JP1997019946025.07.1997         Original published format: JP 19946097
JP1997019946125.07.1997         Original published format: JP 19946197
[1998/46]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9817453
Date:30.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0876888
Date:11.11.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.1998
[1998/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0876888
Date:12.12.2012
Language:EN
[2012/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.04.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:B29B13/10, B01J20/26
[1998/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1998/46]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung wasserabsorbierender Harze[2012/24]
English:Process for producing water-absorbing resins[2012/44]
French:Procédé de production de résines absorbant l'eau[2012/44]
Former [1998/46]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG WASSERABSORBIERENDER HARZE
Former [1998/46]METHOD OF PRODUCTION OF WATER-ABSORBING RESIN
Former [1998/46]PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE RESINE ABSORBANT L'EAU
Entry into regional phase19.06.1998Translation filed 
19.06.1998National basic fee paid 
19.06.1998Search fee paid 
19.06.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
19.06.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.06.1998Examination requested  [1998/46]
14.11.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.05.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.09.2012Fee for grant paid
07.09.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.12.2003
Opposition(s)13.09.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
10.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
29.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
28.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
28.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
26.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
25.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
26.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 12
26.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 13
27.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 14
26.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 15
30.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 16
Documents cited:Search[X]US3423035  (CONVALLE GIOVANNI, et al) [X] 16 * claim 1 *;
 [X]DE3712557  (BUEHLER AG GEB [CH]) [X] 19 * claim 1 *;
 [X]US3453221  (RICHART DOUGLAS STEPHEN) [X] 19 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US4690788  (YADA AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPS61110510
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861007), vol. 010, no. 295, Database accession no. (M - 523), [A] 1-19 * abstract *
International search[Y]JPH07185331  (NALCO CHEMICAL CO);
 [Y]JPH032042B  ;
 [Y]JPH04317739  (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD);
 [Y]JPS61110510  (DAI ICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO LTD)