Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0944739

EP0944739 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ANALYSIS OF CHROMATOGRAPHIC MIGRATION PATTERNS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.02.2005
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.02.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.04.2005  [2005/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
University Of Utah Research Foundation
Suite 170, 416 Wakara Way
Salt Lake City, UT 84108 / US
[1999/39]
Inventor(s)01 / MARKS, Andy, F.
175 South West Temple 530
Salt Lake City, UT 84101 / US
[1999/39]
Representative(s)Dost, Wolfgang , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/39]Dost, Wolfgang, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler . Isenbruck Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date97944372.816.09.1997
[1999/39]
WO1997US16933
Priority number, dateUS19960025241P16.09.1996         Original published format: US 25241 P
[1999/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9811258
Date:19.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0944739
Date:29.09.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.1998
[1999/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.03.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68, G06F17/17, G06F17/00
[1999/49]
Former International [1999/39]C12Q1/68, G06F17/17
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/39]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND APPARAT ZUR ANALYSE VON CHROMATOGRAFISCHEN AUFTRENNUNGSMUSTERN[1999/39]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ANALYSIS OF CHROMATOGRAPHIC MIGRATION PATTERNS[1999/39]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR ANALYSER DES MOTIFS DE MIGRATIONS CHROMATOGRAPHIQUES[1999/39]
Entry into regional phase16.04.1999National basic fee paid 
16.04.1999Search fee paid 
16.04.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
16.04.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.03.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
16.04.1999Examination requested  [1999/39]
07.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/14]
29.10.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
25.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
25.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.199903   M06   Fee paid on   29.11.1999
30.09.200408   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9605565  (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,12,13 * page 1, line 3 - page 5, line 7; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]  - TSUMOTO S ET AL, "Automated discovery of functional components of proteins from amino-acid sequences based on rough sets and change of representation", KDD-95 PROCEEDINGS. FIRST INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON KNOWLEDGE DISCOVERY AND DATA MINING, PROCEEDINGS OF FIRST INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON KNOWLEDGE DISCOVERY AND DATA MINING (KDD-95), MONTREAL, QUE., CANADA, 20-21 AUG. 1995, 1995, Menlo Park, CA, USA, AAAI, USA, ISBN 0-929280-82-2, pages 318 - 324, XP002119589 [A] 1,2,12,13 * page 318, column L, line 1 - page 324, column L, line 40 *
 [A]  - KOLASKAR A S ET AL, "Parallel computers in biological data bank management", CODATA. NEW DATA CHALLENGES IN OUR INFORMATION AGE. PROCEEDINGS OF THE THIRTEENTH INTERNATIONAL CODATA CONFERENCE (IN COLLABORATION WITH THE ICSU PANEL ON WORLD DATA CENTERS), PROCEEDINGS OF 13TH INTERNATIONAL CODATA CONFERENCE ON NEW DATA CHALLENGES, 1994, Paris, France, CODATA, France, pages C/165 - 73, XP002119590 [A] 1,2,12,13 * abstract *
International search[A]US5365455  (TIBBETTS CLARK [US], et al);
 [A]US5273632  (STOCKHAM THOMAS G [US], et al)