EP1007151 - SYSTEM TO REDUCE DEFIBRILLATION REQUIREMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.08.2003 [2003/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARDIAC PACEMAKERS, INC. 4100 Hamline Avenue North St. Paul, Minnesota 55112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states Cardiac Pacemakers, Inc. 4100 North Hamline Avenue St. Paul Minnesota 55112 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KENKNIGHT, Bruce, H. 16552 83rd Avenue North Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97944456.9 | 25.09.1997 | [2000/24] | WO1997US17233 | Priority number, date | US19960720360 | 27.09.1996 Original published format: US 720360 | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9813102 | Date: | 02.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1007151 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/39 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
A61N1/39622 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IE, IT [2000/24] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR VERRINGERUNG VON DEFIBRILLATIONSANFORDERUNGEN | [2000/24] | English: | SYSTEM TO REDUCE DEFIBRILLATION REQUIREMENTS | [2000/24] | French: | SYSTEME DE REDUCTION DES BESOINS DE DEFIBRILLATION | [2000/24] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.04.1999 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 25.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/33] | 12.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.11.1999 | 30.09.2002 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0467652 (TELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [X] 1-3,8,10,13 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0588124 (SIEMENS ELEMA AB [SE]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5350401 (LEVINE PAUL A [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]WO9528987 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [X] 1-3,11,13-18 * abstract *; | [X]WO9528988 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [X] 1-3,11,13-18 * abstract *; | [XD]US5464429 (HEDBERG SVEN-ERIK [SE], et al) [XD] 1 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9701373 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [PX] 1-8,11,13-18,20 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4559946 | US4693253 | US5366485 | US5431682 | US5464429 | US5522853 |