Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0967860

Designated contracting statesAT 
BE 
CH 
DE 
DK 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
IE 
IT 
LI 
LU 
MC 
NL 
PT 
SE 
Examination procedure08.04.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2002/36]
Entry into regional phase19.05.1999National basic fee paid 
19.05.1999Search fee paid 
19.05.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
19.05.1999Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
07.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
26.08.1999M01   Fee paid on   01.09.1999
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:05.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:05.01.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19990527
 
Event date:17.05.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A4
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:17.05.2000 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20000330
 
Event date:21.03.2001 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20010205
 
Event date:04.09.2002 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20020205