Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0967860

EP0967860 - SPRAY ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.07.2002
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.09.2002  [2002/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Enviromist Industries Pty. Ltd
1st floor, 176 Fullarton Road
Dulwich, S.A. 5065 / AU
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / SIMNACHER, Guarian
816B Black Diamond Way
Lodi, CA 95380 / US
02 / ZANKER, Keith, Alfred
21 Gilbert Street
Berri, S.A. 5343 / AU
03 / VASEY, Christopher, Scott
330 Caddy Road
Bamera, S.A. 5345 / AU
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Gilmour, David Cedric Franklyn , et al
Forresters
15 Hamilton Square
Birkenhead
Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Gilmour, David Cedric Franklyn , et al
POTTS, KERR & CO. 15 Hamilton Square
Birkenhead, Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB
Application number, filing date97944636.622.10.1997
[2000/01]
WO1997AU00704
Priority number, dateAU1996PO0313522.10.1996         Original published format: AU PO313596
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9817105
Date:30.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0967860
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.1998
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU30.04.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:A01M7/00, B05B1/28
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:SPRÜHEINRICHTUNG[2000/01]
English:SPRAY ASSEMBLY[2000/01]
French:SYSTEME DE PULVERISATION[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase19.05.1999National basic fee paid 
19.05.1999Search fee paid 
19.05.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
19.05.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.03.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
27.05.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
05.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.11.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.02.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/36]
08.04.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2002/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
07.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
26.08.1999M01   Fee paid on   01.09.1999
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]GB2166980  (UNIV MICHIGAN STATE [US]);
 [Y]US5419493  (REDWAY GRAHAM J [AU]);
 [Y]AU2260753  ;
 [X]US5139200  (GREIMANN FLOYD D [US], et al);
 [X]US4353505  (KINDER LEON);
 [X]US5248090  (WILLIAMSON JOHN C [US])
by applicantWO8701909
 AU5042479