EP1025452 - CAMERA GUIDE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.02.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.2004 [2004/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wells & Verne Investments Ltd Hemisphere House, 36 Hilgrove Street St. Helier Jersey JE4 8TR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | For all designated states Wells & Vernes Investments Ltd Hemisphere House, 36 Hilgrove Street St. Helier, Jersey JE4 8TR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSEN, Karl Route du Mandement 453 CH-1282 Dardagny / CH | [2000/32] | Representative(s) | Wenger, Joel-Théophile Leman Consulting S.A. Chemin de Précossy 31 1260 Nyon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/31] | Wenger, Joel-Théophile Leman Consulting S.A. 62 route de Clementy 1260 Nyon / CH | ||
Former [2000/32] | Wenger, Joel-Théophile c/o Griffes Consulting S.A. Route de Florissant 81 1206 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 97944674.7 | 24.10.1997 | [2000/32] | WO1997CH00405 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9819176 | Date: | 07.05.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1025452 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/14, G01C21/16 | [2000/32] | CPC: |
G01C21/165 (EP,US);
G01S19/14 (EP);
G01S19/53 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/32] | Title | German: | KAMERAFÜHRUNGSSYSTEM | [2000/32] | English: | CAMERA GUIDE SYSTEM | [2000/32] | French: | SYSTEM DE GUIDAGE DE CAMERA | [2000/32] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/32] | 27.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/13] | 21.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   15.04.2003 | 31.10.2003 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5193064 (MAKI STANLEY C [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [Y]US5210540 (MASUMOTO YUTAKA [JP]) [Y] 6 * column 4, line 12 - column 5, line 49 *; | [A]EP0578316 (PRODUCTION ET DE CREATION AUDI [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5374933 (KAO WEI-WEN [US]) [Y] 7 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 11 *; | [A]US5406489 (TIMOTHY LAMAR K [US], et al) [A] 1 * column W *; | [DXAY]EP0660131 (OSEN KARL [CH]) [DX] 1,10 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 16; claims 1,3,4,6-8 * [A] 2-4,8,9 [Y] 6,7 |