Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0950061

EP0950061 - HEAT SHOCK PROTEIN COMPLEXES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.04.2003
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.06.2003  [2003/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The University of New Mexico
Hokano Hall, Zuni Wig, Room 357
Albuquerque, NM 87131 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/42]For all designated states
The University of New Mexico
Hokano Hall, Zuni Wig, Room 357
Albuquerque, NM 87131 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WALLEN, Erik, S.
3901 Montgomery, N.E. 308
Albuquerque, NM 87109 / US
02 / ROIGAS, Jan
Rheingold Strasse, 37
D-10318 - Berlin / DE
03 / MOSLEY, Pope, L.
9420 Eagle Rock, N.E.
Albuquerque, NM 87122 / US
[1999/44]
Former [1999/42]01 / WALLEN, Erik, S.
3901 Montgomery, N.E. 308
Albuquerque, NM 87109 / US
02 / ROIGAS, Jan
Papelallee 36/37
D-10437 Berlin / DE
03 / MOSLEY, Pope, L.
9420 Eagle Rock, N.E.
Albuquerque, NM 87122 / US
Representative(s)Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/42]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Winzererstrasse 106
80797 München / DE
Application number, filing date97945246.319.09.1997
[1999/42]
WO1997US16937
Priority number, dateUS1996071723920.09.1996         Original published format: US 717239
US1997093413919.09.1997         Original published format: US 934139
[1999/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9812208
Date:26.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0950061
Date:20.10.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.1998
[1999/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.03.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07K1/16, C07K1/18, C07K1/22, C07K5/00, C07K14/39, C07K14/47
[2002/18]
Former International [1999/42]C07K1/16, C07K1/18, C07K1/22, C07K5/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/42]
TitleGerman:HITZESCHOCKPROTEINKOMPLEXE[1999/42]
English:HEAT SHOCK PROTEIN COMPLEXES[1999/42]
French:COMPLEXES DE PROTEINES DE CHOC THERMIQUE[1999/42]
Entry into regional phase19.04.1999National basic fee paid 
19.04.1999Search fee paid 
19.04.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
19.04.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.04.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
19.04.1999Examination requested  [1999/42]
18.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.12.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/24]
10.01.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2003/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
26.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]  - D R PALLEROS ET AL., "Hsp70-protein complexes", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY., AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, BALTIMORE, MD., US, (19940506), vol. 269, no. 18, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 13107 - 13114, XP002130137 [X] 27-32 * figure 6 *
 [X]  - S TAKEDA & D B MCKAY, "Kinetics of peptide binding to the bovine 70kDa heat shock cognate protein, a molecular chaperone", BIOCHEMISTRY., AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, PA., US, (1996), vol. 35, no. 14, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 4636 - 4644, XP002130138 [X] 27-32 * figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi952903o
 [X]  - F J CORRALES & A E FERSHT, "Toward a mechanism for GroEl-GroEs chaperone activity: an ATPase-gated and -pulsed folding and annealing cage", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA., NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON., US, (19960430), vol. 93, no. 9, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 4509 - 4512, XP002130139 [X] 27-32 * figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.9.4509
 [X]  - N BROT ET AL., "Similarity of nucleotide interactions of BiP and GTP-binding proteins", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA., NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON., US, (199412), vol. 91, no. 25, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 12120 - 12124, XP002130140 [X] 27-34 * the whole document *
 [X]  - L SHI ET AL., "Conformational characterization of DnaK and its complexes by small-angle X-ray scattering", BIOCHEMISTRY., AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, PA., US, (1996), vol. 35, no. 10, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 3297 - 3308, XP002130141 [X] 27-32 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi951984l
 [X]  - C K KASSENBROCK & R B KELLY, "Interaction of heavy chain binding protein (BiP/GRP78) with adenine nucleotides", EMBO JOURNAL, EYNSHAM, OXFORD GB, (1989), vol. 8, no. 5, pages 1461 - 1467, XP002130142 [X] 27-34 * the whole document *
 [X]  - D R PALLEROS ET AL., "Interaction of hsp70 with unfolded proteins; effects of temperature and nucleotides on the kinetics of binding", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA., NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON., US, (199107), vol. 88, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 5719 - 5723, XP002130143 [X] 27-32 * the whole document *
 [X]  - B FEIFEL ET AL., "Potassium ions and the molecular-chaperone activity of DnaK", BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS, (1996), vol. 1996, Database accession no. 219226, XP002130146 [X] 27-332
    [] - EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, BERLIN, DE, (1996), vol. 237, no. 1, ISSN 0014-2956, pages 318 - 321, [ ] * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE MEDLINE, (19000101), Database accession no. 85295953, XP002130145 [A] 1-26
 [D]  - W J WELCH & J R FERAMISCO, "Rapid purification of mammalian 70, 000-dalton stress proteins; affinity of the proteins for nucleotides", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY., AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON., US, (198506), vol. 5, no. 6, ISSN 0270-7306, pages 1229 - 1237, [D] * abstract *
 [PX]  - P PENG ET AL., "Purification of immunogenic heat shock protein 70-peptide complexes by ADP-affinity chromatography", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, NEW YORK US, (1997), vol. 204, pages 13 - 21, XP002130144 [PX] 1-26 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1759(97)00017-3
International search[A]  - THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, 09 August 1996, Vol. 271, No. 32, MINAMI et al., "Regulation of the Heat-Shock Protein 70 Reaction Cycle by the Mammalian DnaJ Homolog, HSP40", pages 19617-19624.,
 [A]  - THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, 17 February 1995, Vol. 270, No. 7, GREENE et al., "Effect of Nucleotide on the Binding of Peptides to 70-kDa Heat Shock Protein", pages 2967-2973.,
 [A]  - BIOCHEMISTRY, 1994, Vol. 33, HA et al., "ATPase Kinetics of Recombinant Bovine 70 kDa Heat Shock Cognate Protein and Its Amino-Terminal ATPase Domain", pages 14625-14635.,