Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0998685

EP0998685 - A DIGITAL ARRAY FOR RADIOGRAPHIC IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.08.2005
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 20.02.2008  [2008/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Direct Radiography Corp.
600 Technology Drive
Newark, DE 19714 / US
[2000/26]
Former [2000/19]For all designated states
Direct Radiography Corp.
Glasgow Business Community, Building 600, Box 6101
Newark, DE 19714-6101 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CROWELL, John, A.
3319 Breidablik Drive
Wilmington, DE 19807 / US
02 / PERROTTO, Joseph, A.
116 Pine Hill Road
Landenberg, PA 19350 / US
03 / JEROMIN, Lothar, S.
912 Branch Road
Newark, DE 19711 / US
04 / LEE, Denny, L., Y.
1009 Saber Road
West Chester, PA 19382 / US
[2000/19]
Representative(s)Hillier, Peter , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/19]Hillier, Peter , et al
Reginald W. Barker & Co., Cliffords Inn Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BY / GB
Application number, filing date97945594.605.11.1997
[2000/19]
WO1997US20008
Priority number, dateUS1996075604126.11.1996         Original published format: US 756041
[2000/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9823975
Date:04.06.1998
Language:EN
[1998/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0998685
Date:10.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.1998
[2000/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0998685
Date:13.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.06.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01T1/24
[2000/19]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/19]
TitleGerman:DIGITALES MATRIX ZUR RADIOGRAPHISCHEN ABBILDUNG[2000/19]
English:A DIGITAL ARRAY FOR RADIOGRAPHIC IMAGING[2000/19]
French:ENSEMBLE NUMERIQUE D'IMAGERIE RADIOGRAPHIQUE[2000/19]
Entry into regional phase24.05.1999National basic fee paid 
24.05.1999Search fee paid 
24.05.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
24.05.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.06.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
25.05.1999Examination requested  [2000/19]
26.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.07.2004Fee for grant paid
09.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
26.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT13.10.2004
[2008/08]
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[AP]US5635718  (DEPUYDT JAMES M [US], et al);
 [A]US5195113  (KUWABARA OSAMU [JP])