Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0949923

EP0949923 - STABILISED PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS, BASED ON QUINUPRISTINE AND DALFOPRISTINE, AND THEIR PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/42]STABILISED PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS, WITH QUINUPRISTINE AND DALFOPRISTINE BASE AND THEIR PREPARATION
[2002/16]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2003
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.08.2003  [2003/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aventis Pharma S.A.
20, avenue Raymond Aron
92160 Antony / FR
[2002/36]
Former [1999/42]For all designated states
RHONE-POULENC RORER S.A.
20, avenue Raymond Aron
92160 Antony / FR
Inventor(s)01 / BOUNINE, Jean-Paul
35 bis, rue Georges Médéric
F-94700 Maisons Alfort / FR
02 / CONRATH, Guillaume
424, avenue de la Division Leclerc
F-92290 Châtenay Malabry / FR
[1999/42]
Application number, filing date97945926.014.11.1997
[1999/42]
WO1997FR02047
Priority number, dateFR1996001406219.11.1996         Original published format: FR 9614062
[1999/42]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9822107
Date:28.05.1998
Language:FR
[1998/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0949923
Date:20.10.1999
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.1998
[1999/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0949923
Date:04.09.2002
Language:FR
[2002/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.05.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/44, A61K31/42, A61K47/02
[1999/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/42]
Extension statesLT18.05.1999
LV18.05.1999
RO18.05.1999
SI18.05.1999
TitleGerman:AUF QUINUPRISTIN UND DALFOPRISTIN BASIERTE STABILISIERTE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, UND DEREN ZUBEREITUNG[2002/16]
English:STABILISED PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS, BASED ON QUINUPRISTINE AND DALFOPRISTINE, AND THEIR PREPARATION[2002/16]
French:COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES STABILISEES, A BASE DE QUINUPRISTINE ET DE DALFOPRISTINE ET LEUR PREPARATION[1999/42]
Former [1999/42]AUF QUINUPRISTIN UND DALFOPRISTIN BASIERTE STABILISIERTE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSTELLUNG UND DESSEN ZUBEREITUNG
Former [1999/42]STABILISED PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS, WITH QUINUPRISTINE AND DALFOPRISTINE BASE AND THEIR PREPARATION
Entry into regional phase18.05.1999National basic fee paid 
18.05.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
18.05.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.05.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.05.1999Examination requested  [1999/42]
25.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.07.2002Fee for grant paid
04.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search   [ ] 'The Merck Index, compound 4703', 1989, MERCK AND CO. INC., WHITEHOUSE STATION, NJ, USA
International search[A]EP0135410  (RHONE POULENC SANTE [FR]) [A] 1 * page 57; examples A,B *;
 [DA]EP0248703  (RHONE POULENC SANTE [FR]) [DA] 1 * page 28, line 3 - line 18 *;
 [A]  - BERNARD E. ET AL, "Pharmakokinetics and suction blister fluid penetration of a semisynthetic injectable streptogramin RP59500", EUR. J. MICROBIOL. INFECT. DIS., (1994), vol. 13, no. 9, pages 768 - 771, XP002037989 [A] 1 * page 768, column 2, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01973993