blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0957144 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0957144



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 151
29.11.2004 Closing of application Search / examination 1
17.08.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
03.03.2004 Annex to a communication Search / examination 7
03.03.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
03.03.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.01.2004 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 1
12.01.2004 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
31.12.2003 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 1
15.03.2000 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
15.02.2000 Translation of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 3
10.01.2000 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
14.12.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
14.12.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.12.1999 European search report Search / examination 2
23.10.1999 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
23.10.1999 Translation of priority document Search / examination 29
06.10.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
08.09.1999 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
18.08.1999 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
04.08.1999 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
07.07.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
07.07.1999 Annex Search / examination 12
07.07.1999 Claims Search / examination 1
07.07.1999 Description Search / examination 24
07.07.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
23.12.1998 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 3
09.09.1998 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
18.06.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
18.06.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 18
18.06.1998 Priority document Search / examination 20