blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0957144


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
03.12.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  19.01.2005  [2005/03]
13.08.2004 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
27.02.2004 First examination report
23.02.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
09.01.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.01.2003 Renewal fee
05.02.2002 Renewal fee
05.01.2001 Renewal fee
11.01.2000 Renewal fee
11.12.1999 Supplementary search report published on  26.01.2000 [2000/04]
01.10.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.11.1999 [1999/46]
01.10.1999 Request for examination filed published on  17.11.1999 [1999/46]
20.09.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
02.08.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
16.07.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
28.09.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
23.06.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
23.12.1997 PCT data prior to European publication