blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0957144
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0957144Global Dossier 26.01.2000A4
EP0957144 17.11.1999A1
Priority number Date
JP9704480 08.12.1997
JP32875496 09.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU5138098 03.07.1998A
Priority number Date
JP9704480 08.12.1997
JP32875496 09.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6770688 03.08.2004B1
Priority number Date
JP9704480 08.12.1997
JP32875496 09.12.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9826016Global Dossier 18.06.1998A1
Priority number Date
JP32875496 09.12.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1090658C 11.09.2002C
CN1239978 29.12.1999A
Priority number Date
JP32875496 09.12.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100344728B 20.07.2002B1
KR20000069326 25.11.2000A
Priority number Date
JP32875496 09.12.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW358116B 11.05.1999B
Priority number Date
JP32875496 09.12.1996