blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0957144

Designated contracting statesDE 
FR 
GB 
Examination procedure17.08.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/03]
Entry into regional phase07.07.1999Translation filed 
07.07.1999National basic fee paid 
18.08.1999Search fee paid 
07.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
24.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
19.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
16.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:17.11.1999 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:17.11.1999 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19990707
 
Event date:26.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A4
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:26.01.2000 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19991214
 
Event date:14.04.2004 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20040303
 
Event date:19.01.2005 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20040714