Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0957144

EP0957144 - WATER-BASED BALLPOINT INK COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.12.2004
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.01.2005  [2005/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI PENCIL KABUSHIKI KAISHA
23-37, Higashi-Ohi 5-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 140 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/46]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI PENCIL KABUSHIKI KAISHA
23-37, Higashi-Ohi 5-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 140 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MIYAMOTO, Masaru
13-8-207, Idogayashimo-cho,Minami-ku,Yokohama-shi
Kanagawa 232 / JP
[1999/46]
Representative(s)Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L.
Patentanwälte
John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/46]Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR
Patentanwälte, John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date97946134.008.12.1997
[1999/46]
WO1997JP04480
Priority number, dateJP1996032875409.12.1996         Original published format: JP 32875496
[1999/46]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9826016
Date:18.06.1998
Language:EN
[1998/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0957144
Date:17.11.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.1998
[1999/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP18.06.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:C09D11/18
[1999/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1999/46]
TitleGerman:WÄSSRIGE TINTENZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR KUGELSCHREIBER[1999/46]
English:WATER-BASED BALLPOINT INK COMPOSITION[1999/46]
French:COMPOSITION D'ENCRE A BASE D'EAU POUR STYLO A BILLE[1999/46]
Entry into regional phase07.07.1999Translation filed 
07.07.1999National basic fee paid 
18.08.1999Search fee paid 
07.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.02.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
07.07.1999Examination requested  [1999/46]
03.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/03]
17.08.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
24.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
19.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
16.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2729966  (MITSUBISHI PENCIL CO [JP]) [X] 1-4 * page 19, lines 31,10,20; example COMP.3; table 1 *;
 [X]WO9510571  (GILLETTE CO [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 1, line 4; claim 14 * * page 3, lines 28-37, paragraph 2 * * page 6, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 9, paragraph 4 *;
 [A]JPS5749678  ;
 [A]JPH06346014  ;
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820707), vol. 006, no. 122, Database accession no. (C - 112), [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950428), vol. 1995, no. 03, [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE COMPENDEX, (19000101), Database accession no. EIX89110374575, XP002123779 [A] 1,2
 [A]  - DATABASE COMPENDEX, (19000101), Database accession no. EIX85040049151, XP002123780 [A] 1,2
International search[X]JPH07266778  (PILOT PEN CO LTD);
 [Y]JPH01301760  (PENTEL KK);
 [Y]JPH0873787  (SEIKO EPSON CORP)