Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0891881

EP0891881 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CURVED-SURFACE TRANSFER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.04.2004
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.06.2004  [2004/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD.
1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-Cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 162-01 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/03]For all designated states
DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD.
1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-Cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 162-01 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KOBAYASHI, K. Dai N. Printing Co., Ltd.
1-1, Ichiggaya-Kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 162-01 / JP
02 / MIYAKOSHI, M. Dai N. Printing Co., Ltd.
1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 162-01 / JP
03 / OKAMOTO, Masaru Dai Nippon P. Co., Ltd.
1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 162-01 / JP
04 / MIYASHITA, Haruo Dai Nippon P. Co., Ltd.
1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 162-01 / JP
05 / YOSHIKAWA, H. Dai N. Printing Co., Ltd.
1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 162-01 / JP
06 / ONO, Haruo Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd.
1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 162-01 / JP
07 / KAN, Reiko Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd.
1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 162-01 / JP
08 / KITAMURA, Kazuo Dai Nippon P. Co., Ltd.
1-1, Ichigigaya-Kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 162-01 / JP
09 / ICHIHASHI, Tutomu Dai Nippon P. Co., Ltd.
1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 162-01 / JP
[1999/03]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/03]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date97946143.108.12.1997
[1999/03]
WO1997JP04490
Priority number, dateJP1996035667227.12.1996         Original published format: JP 35667296
JP1997006012628.02.1997         Original published format: JP 6012697
[1999/03]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9829265
Date:09.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0891881
Date:20.01.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.1998
[1999/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0891881
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP09.07.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:B44C1/17, B44C1/16, B65C3/00, B65C9/26, B41M3/12
[2002/42]
Former International [2001/10]B44C1/17, B44C1/16, B65C3/00, B65C9/26
Former International [1999/03]B44C1/17
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1999/03]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ÜBERTRAGEN AUF GEWÖLBTE FLÄCHEN[1999/03]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CURVED-SURFACE TRANSFER[1999/03]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSFERT SUR DES SURFACES COURBES[1999/03]
Entry into regional phase28.09.1998Translation filed 
28.09.1998National basic fee paid 
28.09.1998Search fee paid 
28.09.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
28.09.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.09.1998Examination requested  [1999/03]
26.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.02.2003Fee for grant paid
06.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
20.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
19.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
20.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS5374906  ;
 [A]JPH02282000  ;
 [A]JPS5811189
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1985, no. 23, Database accession no. 1985-139466, XP002157367 & JPS5374906 A 19780703 (DAINIPPON PRINTING) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1991, no. 01, Database accession no. 1991-004362, XP002157368 & JPH02282000 A 19901119 (TOPPAN PRINTING) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1990, no. 11, Database accession no. 1990-081392, XP002157369 & JPS5811189 A 19830121 (NIPPON SHASHIN INSATSU) [A] 1 * abstract *
International search[P]JPH09315095  (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD);
 [A]JPS51106508  (ICI LTD);
 [A]JPH068697  (NISSHA PRINTING);
 [A]JPH08216599  (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD);
 [A]JPH08244399  (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD);
 [A]JP7067848B