Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969852

EP0969852 - COMBINATION THERAPY FOR THE TREATMENT OF DIABETES AND OBESITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  17.07.2009
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2009Refusal of applicationpublished on 19.08.2009  [2009/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merck & Co., Inc.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
MERCK & CO., INC.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SMITH, Roy, G.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065 / US
02 / CASCIERI, Margaret, A.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065 / US
03 / MACINTYRE, Euan
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065 / US
04 / MACNEIL, Douglas, J.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065 / US
05 / MENKE, John, G.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Horgan, James Michael Frederic , et al
Merck & Co., Inc.
European Patent Department
Merck Sharpe & Dohme Limited
Hertford Road, Hoddesdon
Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/49]Horgan, James Michael Frederic , et al
Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited, Hertford Road, Hoddesdon
Hertfordshire, EN11 9BU / GB
Former [2000/02]Horgan, James Michael Frederic , et al
Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road
Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB
Application number, filing date97946442.730.10.1997
[2000/02]
WO1997US19880
Priority number, dateUS19960029233P31.10.1996         Original published format: US 29233 P
GB1997001104230.05.1997         Original published format: GB 9711042
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9818481
Date:07.05.1998
Language:EN
[1998/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969852
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.1998
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.05.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.2004
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/00, A61K31/55, A61K31/495, A61K31/44, A61K31/47, A61K31/445, A61K38/22, A61K45/06
[2004/19]
Former International [2000/02]A61K38/00, A61K31/55, A61K31/495, A61K31/44, A61K31/47, A61K31/445
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:KOMBINATIONSTHERAPIE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON DIABETES UND FETTSUCHT[2000/02]
English:COMBINATION THERAPY FOR THE TREATMENT OF DIABETES AND OBESITY[2000/02]
French:THERAPIE PAR COMBINAISON D'AGENTS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU DIABETE ET DE L'OBESITE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase31.05.1999National basic fee paid 
31.05.1999Search fee paid 
31.05.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
31.05.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.05.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
31.05.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
07.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.03.2007Date of oral proceedings
29.03.2007Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/34]
29.03.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
05.06.2009Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/34]
Appeal following examination03.05.2007Appeal received No.  T1679/07
31.07.2007Statement of grounds filed
05.06.2009Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn
09.07.2009Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
07.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
06.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
06.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
07.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
05.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
15.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[DY]WO9616542  (SYNAPTIC PHARMA CORP) [DY] 1-13 * claims 1,2,18,26 *;
 [DY]US5561142  (OK DONG ET AL) [DY] 1-7,10-13 * column 2, line 5 - line 14; example 70; claims 9-12,18 *;
 [DY]US5554621  (POINDEXTER GRAHAM S ET AL) [DY] 8 * column 6, line 14 - line 45; claim - *;
 [DY]US5552524  (BASINSKI MARGRET B ET AL) [DY] 9 * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 35 * * column 16, line 48 - column 17, line 30 *;
 [PA]WO9716189  (SMITH ROY G ;MERCK & CO INC (US)) [PA] 1-13 * claim - *
International search[YP]US5635503  ;
 [YP]US5602024  ;
 [Y]US5561142  ;
 [Y]US5554621  ;
 [Y]US5552524