Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0871845

EP0871845 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR REAL-TIME SPECTRAL ALIGNMENT FOR OPEN-PATH FOURIER TRANSFORM INFRARED SPECTROMETERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 20.02.2008  [2008/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AIL SYSTEMS, INC.
455 Commack Road Deer Park
New York 11729 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/43]For all designated states
AIL SYSTEMS, INC.
455 Commack Road
Deer Park, New York 11729 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Chung-Tao, David
11 Oxford Avenue
Melville, NY 11747 / US
02 / KAGANN, Robert, Howard
2895 Bordeaux Boulevard
Cumming, GA 30131 / US
[1998/43]
Representative(s)Burke, Steven David , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/43]Burke, Steven David , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date97946541.603.11.1997
[1998/43]
WO1997US20180
Priority number, dateUS1996074329504.11.1996         Original published format: US 743295
[1998/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9820299
Date:14.05.1998
Language:EN
[1998/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0871845
Date:21.10.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1998
[1998/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0871845
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.05.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01B9/02, G01J3/453
[2000/03]
Former International [1998/43]G01B9/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1998/43]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ECHTZEITSPEKTRALAUSRICHTUNG IN FOURIER-TRANSFORMATION-INFRAROTSPEKTROMETERN MIT OFFENEM WEG[1998/46]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR REAL-TIME SPECTRAL ALIGNMENT FOR OPEN-PATH FOURIER TRANSFORM INFRARED SPECTROMETERS[1998/43]
French:APPAREIL ET TECHNIQUE CORRESPONDANTE PERMETTANT UN ALIGNEMENT SPECTRAL EN TEMPS REEL POUR SPECTROMETRE INFRAROUGE A TRAJECTOIRE OUVERTE A TRANSFORMEE DE FOURIER[1998/43]
Former [1998/43]APPARAT UND VERFAHREN ZUR ECHTZEITSPEKTRALAUSRICHTUNG IN EINEM FOURIER TRANSORMATION INFRAROT SPEKTROMETER MIT OFFENEM WEG
Entry into regional phase03.08.1998National basic fee paid 
03.08.1998Search fee paid 
03.06.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
09.11.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.11.1998Examination requested  [1999/01]
14.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
20.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
12.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.07.2002Fee for grant paid
15.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT25.09.2002
[2008/08]
Documents cited:Search[A]  PRESES J M, "FOURIER-TRANSFORM SPECTROPHOTOMETER FOR TIME-RESOLVED EMISSION MEASUREMENTS USING A 100-POINT TRANSIENT DIGITIZER", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS,US,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, vol. 64, no. 1, ISSN 0034-6748, page 95-102, XP000330731 [A] 1,9 * page 99, column L, line 23 - column R, line 21; figure 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1144409
 [A]  EISMANN U ET AL, "FFT-PROZESSOR FUER EIN PLANETEN-INFRAROT-FOURIERSPEKTROMETER", NACHRICHTENTECHNIK ELEKTRONIK,DE,VEB VERLAG TECHNIK. BERLIN, vol. 42, no. 6, ISSN 0323-4657, page 242-245, XP000316231 [A] 10 * the whole document *
International search[A]US5247342  (TAMURA YOUICHI [JP], et al)