Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0946321

EP0946321 - MOLTEN STEEL TRANSFER ELEMENT AND ITS MANUFACTURING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.04.2002
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VESUVIUS FRANCE S.A.
68, rue Paul Deudon, B.P. 19
59750 Feignies / FR
[N/P]
Former [1999/40]For all designated states
VESUVIUS FRANCE S.A.
68, rue Paul Deudon, B.P. 19
59750 Feignies / FR
Inventor(s)01 / DUBOIS, Pascal
105, rue Pasteur
F-59750 Feignies / FR
02 / HANSE, Eric
9, rue de la Gayolle
7370 Dour / BE
[1999/40]
Representative(s)Debled, Thierry
Vesuvius Group S.A.
Intellectual Property Department
Rue de Douvrain, 17
7011 Ghlin / BE
[N/P]
Former [1999/40]Debled, Thierry
Vesuvius Group S.A. Intellectual Property Department Rue de Douvrain, 17
7011 Ghlin / BE
Application number, filing date97946752.922.10.1997
[1999/40]
WO1997EP05822
Priority number, dateFR1996001301723.10.1996         Original published format: FR 9613017
[1999/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9817422
Date:30.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0946321
Date:06.10.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.1998
[1999/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0946321
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.04.1998
ClassificationInternational:B22D41/50
[1999/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/40]
Extension statesRO25.05.1999
SI25.05.1999
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM WEITERLEITEN GESCHMOLZENER STÄHLE UND EIN VERFAHREN ZUMHERSTELLEN DIESER VORRICHTUNG[1999/40]
English:MOLTEN STEEL TRANSFER ELEMENT AND ITS MANUFACTURING[1999/40]
French:ELEMENT DE TRANSFERT D'ACIER EN FUSION ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ASSOCIE[1999/40]
Entry into regional phase25.05.1999National basic fee paid 
25.05.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.05.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.05.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.05.1999Examination requested  [1999/40]
15.11.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.12.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.10.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.11.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.02.2001Fee for grant paid
26.02.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.02.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
04.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH23.05.2001
FI23.05.2001
LI23.05.2001
NL23.05.2001
DK23.08.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
AT22.10.2001
LU22.10.2001
ES23.10.2001
BE31.10.2001
[2004/39]
Former [2004/28]CH23.05.2001
FI23.05.2001
LI23.05.2001
NL23.05.2001
DK23.08.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
AT22.10.2001
ES23.10.2001
BE31.10.2001
Former [2003/46]CH23.05.2001
FI23.05.2001
LI23.05.2001
NL23.05.2001
DK23.08.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
AT22.10.2001
BE31.10.2001
Former [2003/31]CH23.05.2001
FI23.05.2001
LI23.05.2001
NL23.05.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
AT22.10.2001
BE31.10.2001
Former [2003/06]CH23.05.2001
FI23.05.2001
LI23.05.2001
NL23.05.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
BE31.10.2001
Former [2002/27]CH23.05.2001
FI23.05.2001
LI23.05.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
Former [2002/15]CH23.05.2001
FI23.05.2001
LI23.05.2001
SE23.08.2001
Former [2002/05]SE23.08.2001
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9300191  (MANNESMANN AG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-3; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO8912519  (DAVY DISTINGTON LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE3420835  (HAGENBURGER CHAMOTTE TON [DE]) [A] 3 * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0589762  (LORRAINE LAMINAGE [FR]) [A] 3 * claim 5 *;
 [A]JPH06218508  (TOSHIBA CERAMICS CO) [A] 1 * figures 1-7 *;
 JPH06218508  [ ];
 [ADP]FR2733705  (VESUVIUS FRANCE SA [FR]) [ADP] 1 * figures 1-3; claim 1 *
    [] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941109), vol. 018, no. 585, Database accession no. (M - 1700), [ ] * abstract *