Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973449

EP0973449 - PNEUMATIC SURGICAL INSTRUMENT FOR THE DISTRIBUTION AND PLACEMENT OF CONNECTING AND FASTENING ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  12.04.2002
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.04.2002Refusal of applicationpublished on 29.05.2002  [2002/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SOFRADIM PRODUCTION
116, avenue du Formans
01600 Trévoux / FR
[2001/21]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
SOFRADIM PRODUCTION
197, avenue Théodore Braun
69400 Villefranche-sur-Saône / FR
Inventor(s)01 / BENCHETRIT, Salomon
93, rue de Finlande
F-69300 Caluire / FR
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Perrier, Jean-Pierre , et al
Cabinet GERMAIN ET MAUREAU, 12, rue Boileau, BP 6153
69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
[2000/04]
Application number, filing date97946786.715.12.1997
[2000/04]
WO1997IB01566
Priority number, dateFR1996001568516.12.1996         Original published format: FR 9615685
[2000/04]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9826718
Date:25.06.1998
Language:FR
[1998/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973449
Date:26.01.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.1998
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.06.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/068, A61B17/10
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2000/04]
TitleGerman:PNEUMATISCHES INSTRUMENT ZUR PLAZIERUNG VON CHIRURGISCHEN KLAMMERN[2000/04]
English:PNEUMATIC SURGICAL INSTRUMENT FOR THE DISTRIBUTION AND PLACEMENT OF CONNECTING AND FASTENING ELEMENTS[2000/04]
French:INSTRUMENT CHIRURGICAL PNEUMATIQUE DE DISTRIBUTION ET DE POSE DE MOYENS DE LIAISON OU DE FIXATION[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase12.06.1999National basic fee paid 
12.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
12.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.06.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.06.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
23.02.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
19.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
19.06.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
14.12.2001Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/22]
24.12.2001Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
12.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[YD]US4569469  (MONGEON DOUGLAS R [US], et al) [YD] 1 * column 8, line 62 - column 9, line 15; figure 3 *;
 [Y]US5257632  (TURKEL DAVID H [US], et al) [Y] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0085931  (INTERMEDICAT GMBH [CH]) [A] 1 * page 16, line 1 - line 17; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4943294  (KNAPP RONALD K [US]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [DA]EP0041022  (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) [DA] 1 * abstract *