Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968029

EP0968029 - METHOD FOR MEASURING THE CUTANEOUS ELECTRIC RESISTANCE OF A PATIENT SUBJECTED TO TRANSDERMAL ADMINISTRATION OF MEDICINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.02.2002
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.04.2002  [2002/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IOMED, INC.
3385 West 1820 South Salt Lake City
Utah 84104 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/24]For all designated states
IOMED, INC.
3385 West 1820 South
Salt Lake City, Utah 84104 / US
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
LABORATOIRES D'HYGIENE ET DE DIETETIQUE
38 avenue Hoche
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / MILLOT, Philippe
3, allée de l'Ormeraie
F-21490 Orgeux / FR
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Colas, Jean-Pierre , et al
Cabinet Lavoix
2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Colas, Jean-Pierre , et al
Cabinet de Boisse et Colas 37, avenue Franklin D. Roosevelt
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date97947082.018.11.1997
[2000/01]
WO1997FR02072
Priority number, dateFR1996001408819.11.1996         Original published format: FR 9614088
[2000/01]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9822182
Date:28.05.1998
Language:FR
[1998/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968029
Date:05.01.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.1998
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.05.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/30, A61B5/05
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/01]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM MESSEN DES ELEKTRISCHEN HAUTWIDERSTANDES EINES PATIENTEN UNTER TRANSDERMALER VERABREICHUNG VON ARZNEIMITTELN[2000/01]
English:METHOD FOR MEASURING THE CUTANEOUS ELECTRIC RESISTANCE OF A PATIENT SUBJECTED TO TRANSDERMAL ADMINISTRATION OF MEDICINE[2000/01]
French:PROCEDE DE MESURE DE LA RESISTANCE ELECTRIQUE CUTANEE D'UN PATIENT SOUMIS A UNE ADMINISTRATION TRANSDERMIQUE DE MEDICAMENT[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase31.05.1999National basic fee paid 
31.05.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
31.05.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.06.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
31.05.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
30.01.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.06.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.11.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2002/15]
13.02.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200105   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]DE4028125  (KLIMKE MARKUS [DE]) [X] 1,2,12 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4141359  (JACOBSEN STEPHEN C, et al) [X] 1,4,6,7,9-12 * column 6, line 34 - column 9, line 14 *;
 [X]EP0558409  (LHD LAB HYGIENE DIETETIQUE [FR]) [X] 1,12 * column 9, line 49 - column 11, line 13 *;
 [X]WO9506497  (ALZA CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,13 * page 34, line 2 - line 7 *;
 [A]WO8906555  (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [A] 1-3,11,13 * page 19, line 26 - page 20, line 2 *;
 [A]US3866600  (REY JEAN PAUL) [A] 1,4-10 * column W *
by applicantFR9604735