Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968635

EP0968635 - A PCB TESTING CIRCUIT FOR AN AUTOMATIC INSERTING APPARATUS AND A TESTING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.11.2001
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.01.2002  [2002/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CO., LTD
541, 5-Ga, Namdaemoon-Ro Jung-Gu
Seoul 100-095 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CO., LTD
541, 5-Ga, Namdaemoon-Ro
Jung-Gu, Seoul 100-095 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / JIN, Sang-Hoon
1553-11, Daemyoung 11-dong
Nam-ku, Taegu 705-041 / KR
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Needle, Jacqueline
Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Needle, Jacqueline
W.H. BECK, GREENER & CO 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn
London WC2A 3SZ / GB
Application number, filing date97947216.405.12.1997
[2000/01]
WO1997KR00256
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9930545
Date:17.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968635
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.1999
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AT17.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:H05K13/00, H05K3/30
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB [2000/01]
TitleGerman:SCHALTUNG UND METHODE ZUN PRÜFEN VON GEDRUCKTENSCHALTUNG[2000/01]
English:A PCB TESTING CIRCUIT FOR AN AUTOMATIC INSERTING APPARATUS AND A TESTING METHOD THEREFOR[2000/01]
French:CIRCUIT D'ESSAI DE CARTE A CIRCUIT IMPRIME POUR APPAREIL D'INSERTION AUTOMATIQUE ET PROCEDE D'ESSAI CORRESPONDANT[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase24.07.1999National basic fee paid 
24.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
24.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
01.07.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/02]
08.08.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200004   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]US4852015  ;
 [Y]JPH07243985  ;
 [Y]US5107497  ;
 [Y]US4914513  ;
 [Y]US5363313  ;
 [A]US5377124  ;
 [A]JPH07271676
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN; & JP 7243985 A (MATSUSHITA) 19 September 1995., & JP7243985 A 19950919
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN; & JP 7271676 A (OKI) 20 October 1995., & JP7271676 A 19951020