Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0961825

EP0961825 - MUTANT PENICILLIN G ACYLASES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.06.2009
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 22.06.2011  [2011/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Route 206 and Province Line Road
Princeton, NJ 08543 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]For all designated states
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
P.O. Box 4000
Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US
Former [1999/49]For all designated states
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
P.O. Box 4000
Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US
Inventor(s)01 / YOU, Li
6316 Westerly Terrace
Jamesville, NY 13078 / US
02 / USHER, John, J.
486 Summerhaven Drive
East Syracuse, NY 13057 / US
03 / WHITE, Brenda, J.
6044 Singletree Lane
Jamesville, NY 13078 / US
04 / NOVOTNY, Jiri
101 Red Hill Road
Princeton, NJ 08540 / US
[1999/49]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/36]Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Former [2007/17]Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Former [1999/49]Josif, Albert, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date97947397.231.10.1997
[1999/49]
WO1997US20298
Priority number, dateUS19960030365P05.11.1996         Original published format: US 30365 P
[1999/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9820120
Date:14.05.1998
Language:EN
[1998/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0961825
Date:08.12.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1998
[1999/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0961825
Date:30.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.05.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:C12N9/84, C12N15/00, C12N1/20, C07H21/04, C12P35/00, C12P37/00
[1999/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/49]
TitleGerman:MUTIERTE PENICILLIN G ACYLASEN[1999/52]
English:MUTANT PENICILLIN G ACYLASES[1999/49]
French:ACYLASES MUTANTES DE LA PENICILLINE G[1999/49]
Former [1999/49]Mutierte Penicillin G Acylasen
Entry into regional phase04.05.1999National basic fee paid 
04.05.1999Search fee paid 
04.05.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
04.05.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.05.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
04.05.1999Examination requested  [1999/49]
23.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.04.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
03.06.2008Fee for grant paid
03.06.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.05.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/28]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
03.06.2008Request for further processing filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
12.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
12.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT30.07.2008
BE30.07.2008
DK30.07.2008
FI30.07.2008
NL30.07.2008
SE30.10.2008
CH31.10.2008
GR31.10.2008
LI31.10.2008
PT30.12.2008
[2011/25]
Former [2010/19]AT30.07.2008
BE30.07.2008
DK30.07.2008
FI30.07.2008
NL30.07.2008
SE30.10.2008
CH31.10.2008
LI31.10.2008
PT30.12.2008
Former [2010/05]AT30.07.2008
BE30.07.2008
DK30.07.2008
FI30.07.2008
NL30.07.2008
CH31.10.2008
LI31.10.2008
PT30.12.2008
Former [2009/19]AT30.07.2008
BE30.07.2008
DK30.07.2008
FI30.07.2008
NL30.07.2008
PT30.12.2008
Former [2009/14]AT30.07.2008
FI30.07.2008
NL30.07.2008
PT30.12.2008
Former [2009/12]FI30.07.2008
NL30.07.2008
PT30.12.2008
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9605318  (GIST BROCADES BV [NL], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,19,20 * page 3, line 10 - line 11 * * page 13, paragraph 3 * * page 15, line 11 - line 18 * * page 21, line 23 - line 28 * * page 23, line 4 - line 5 * * page 46 *;
 [X]EP0453048  (GIST BROCADES NV [NL]) [X] 1,2,6 * page 4, line 3 - line 7 * * page 13, line 53 - line 56 * * page 70 - page 71 *;
 [X]  - DUGGLEBY HJ ET AL., "Penicillin acyclase has a single-amino-acid catalytic center", NATURE, (1995), vol. 373, no. 19, pages 264 - 168, XP001094072 [X] 3,5 * page 267, column 1 * * page 265, column 2, line 3 - line 10 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/373264a0
 [X]  - PRIETO I ET AL., "Penicillin acylase mutants with altered site-directed activity from Kluyvera citrophila", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 33, pages 553 - 559, XP002212833 [X] 4 * page 556 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00172550
 [X]  - WILLIAMS JA AND ZUZEL TJ, "Penicillin G acylase (E.C.3.4.1.11) substrate specific modification by in vitro mutagenesis", J CELL BIOCHEM (SUPPL.), (1985), vol. 9B, page 99, XP002212834 [X] 2 * the whole document *
 [A]  - SCHUMACHER G ET AL., "Penicillin acylase from E. coli: unique gene-protein relation", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1986), vol. 14, no. 14, pages 5713 - 5727, XP002212835 [A] 1-21 * the whole document *
International search[A]  - J. BACTERIOL., October 1992, Vol. 174, No. 19, CHOI et al., "Effects of Site-Directed Mutations on Processing and Activities of Penicillin G Acylase from Escherichia Coli ATCC 11105", pages 6270-6276.,
 [A]  - APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., April 1995, Vol. 43, No. 4, NIERSBACH et al., "Improvement of the Catalytic Properties of Penicillin G Acylase from Escherichia Coli ATCC 11105 by Selection of a New Substrate Specificity", pages 679-684.,