Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0967854

EP0967854 - AUTOMATIC SCALING OF GPS FIELD MAPS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.06.2004
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.06.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.07.2004  [2004/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Case Corporation
700 State Street
Racine, WI 53404 / US
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / HALE, George, H.
314 Meadow Green Drive
Naperville, IL 60565 / US
02 / WENDTE, Keith, W.
10 South 260 Terry Trail
Hinsdale, Illinois 60521 / US
03 / HAACK, Paul, W.
995 Nottingham Lane
Crystal Lake, IL 60014 / US
[2000/09]
Former [2000/01]01 / HALE, George, H.
314 Meadow Green Drive
Naperville, IL 60565 / US
02 / WENDTE, Keith, W.
12 South 612 Knoeble Drive
Lemont, IL 60439 / US
03 / HAACK, Paul, W.
995 Nottingham Lane
Crystal Lake, IL 60014 / US
Representative(s)Uexküll & Stolberg
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date97947565.421.11.1997
[2000/01]
WO1997US21033
Priority number, dateUS1996075490522.11.1996         Original published format: US 754905
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9821928
Date:28.05.1998
Language:EN
[1998/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0967854
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.1998
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0967854
Date:30.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.05.1998
ClassificationInternational:A01B79/00
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2000/01]
TitleGerman:AUTOMATISCHE GPS-FELDKARTENMASSTABANPASSUNG[2000/01]
English:AUTOMATIC SCALING OF GPS FIELD MAPS[2000/01]
French:MISE A L'ECHELLE AUTOMATIQUE DE CARTES AGRICOLES GPS[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase16.06.1999National basic fee paid 
16.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
16.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.06.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
16.06.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
15.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.05.2003Fee for grant paid
14.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
28.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200206   M06   Fee paid on   28.05.2003
Cited inInternational search[XA]WO9516228  (CATERPILLAR INC [US]) [X] 1,3-21,23-41,43-50 * abstract * * page 21, line 1 - line 11 * * page 22, line 12 - page 23, line 29 * * page 30, line 22 - line 24 * [A] 2,22,42;
 [X]DE4342171  (DUERRSTEIN GEORG [DE]) [X] 1,3-21,23-41,43-50 * abstract *;
 [X]US5318475  (SCHROCK MARK D [US], et al) [X] 1,21,41 * column 11, line 18 - line 44 * * column 9, line 38 - line 52 * * abstract *;
 [X]US5220876  (MONSON ROBERT J [US], et al) [X] 1,21,41 * column 8, line 45 - line 55 * * abstract *;
 [XP]DE19528663  (UNIV HOHENHEIM [DE]) [XP] 1,21,41 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0181308  (SOIL TEQ INC [US]) [A] 1-50;
 [A]WO8605353  (DRONNINGBORG MASKINFAB AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-50 * abstract *
by applicantUS5421416