EP0990198 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ACCURATELY DISPENSING LIQUIDS AND SOLIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.12.2003 [2003/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fluid Research Corporation 1382 Bell Avenue Tustin, CA 92780 / US | [2003/14] |
Former [2000/14] | For all designated states Fluid Research Corporation 3505 Cadillac Avenue Costa Mesa, CA 92626 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLINE, David, J. 11 Trafalgar Newport Beach, CA 92660 / US | 02 /
SMITH, Steven 14011 Woodlawn Tustin, CA 92680 / US | 03 /
CLARK, Timothy, S. 797 - 19th Avenue San Francisco, CA 94121 / US | [2000/14] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/14] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97947593.6 | 12.11.1997 | [2000/14] | WO1997US21204 | Priority number, date | US19960752768 | 20.11.1996 Original published format: US 752768 | [2000/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9824722 | Date: | 11.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0990198 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.12.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G05D11/13, B01F15/04, B67D5/30, B67D5/56, F04C18/107 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
B05C5/0225 (EP,US);
B01F25/43141 (EP,US);
B01F35/71775 (EP,US);
B05C11/1005 (EP,US);
B29B7/726 (EP,US);
B29B7/728 (EP,US);
B29B7/748 (EP,US);
F04C13/001 (EP,US);
F04C13/002 (EP,US);
F04C14/06 (EP,US);
F04C14/08 (EP,US);
F04C2/1073 (EP,US);
F04C2210/24 (EP,US);
F04C2210/44 (EP,US);
F04C2220/24 (EP,US);
F04C2270/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/14] | G05D11/04 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [2000/14] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR EXAKTEN ABFÜLLUNG VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN UND FESTSTOFFEN | [2000/14] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ACCURATELY DISPENSING LIQUIDS AND SOLIDS | [2000/14] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR DISTRIBUER AVEC PRECISION DES LIQUIDES ET DES SOLIDES | [2000/14] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.1999 | Search fee paid | 18.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.06.1999 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 08.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/50] | 09.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5046666 (ONO TUNEO [JP]) [X] 1-8,31 * column A * * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 16; figures 2-5 *; | [A]US4778080 (ONO TUNEO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,8,13,15,31 * column A * * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 41 * * column 4, line 17 - column 6, line 14; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US4204574 (STALDER JOHN L [US]) [A] 1,2,13-17,22-26 * column 1, line 18 - column 2, line 11 * * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 39; figure 1 *; | [A]US5305923 (KIRSCHNER JONATHAN [US], et al) [A] 1,2,8,31 * column A * * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 10 * * column 10, line 52 - column 11, line 17; figures 11,14,16,17 *; | [A]FR2732263 (SANDOZ SA [CH]) [A] 1,2,8,14 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph L - page 4, paragraph 3; figure 1 *; | [A]US4718824 (CHOLET HENRI [FR], et al) [A] 1,2,13,15,31 * column A * * column 5, line 1 - column 6, line 24; figures 1,5 *; | [A]US5307288 (HAINES LAWRENCE A [US]) [A] 1-3,5-7,13-19 * column A * * column 1, lines 10-36 * * column 2, lines 3-22; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0494453 (NORDSON CORP [US]) [A] 22,23,27-29 * abstract * * page 5, line 41 - page 6, line 32; figure 1 *; | [A]US4789100 (SENF JOHN W [US]) [A] 1-3,5-9,13,15,22,28,29 * column A; figure 4 *; | [A]US4848657 (HASHIMOTO HIROFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8,13 * column A * * column 3, line 44 - column 5, line 14; figures 1-4 * | International search | [X]US3912426 (TSCHIRKY JOHN E); | [A]US3982858 (TSCHIRKY JOHN E); | [A]US5395221 (TUCKER JR ROBERT C [US], et al) |