blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0993639 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0993639



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 525
01.06.1998 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 36
01.06.1998 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 68
01.06.1998 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 43
01.06.1998 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 66
09.07.1998 Priority document Search / examination 52
09.07.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 62
09.07.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
06.10.1998 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
23.07.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
23.07.1999 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 2
23.07.1999 Annex Search / examination 4
23.07.1999 Annex Search / examination 57
26.07.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
26.07.1999 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
26.07.1999 Annex Search / examination 56
03.08.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.10.1999 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
18.02.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
18.02.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
18.02.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
06.03.2000 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
08.03.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
08.05.2000 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
29.10.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.10.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
23.02.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.02.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.03.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
09.05.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
09.05.2005 Claims Search / examination 3
10.05.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
10.05.2005 Claims Search / examination 3
25.10.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.10.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 22
21.11.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.11.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
03.02.2006 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
17.05.2006 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
04.09.2006 Closing of application Search / examination 1