blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0993639


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
08.09.2006 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  11.10.2006  [2006/41]
11.05.2006 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
31.01.2006 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
18.11.2005 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
27.05.2005 New entry: Reply to examination report
25.02.2005 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
07.01.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.10.2004 First examination report
26.10.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
14.01.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.11.2002 Renewal fee
16.01.2002 Renewal fee
13.12.2000 Renewal fee
03.03.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]
03.03.2000 Supplementary search report published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]
03.03.2000 Request for examination filed published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]
28.02.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
15.02.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
01.01.2000 Renewal fee
03.08.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
28.07.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
27.10.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
25.08.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
19.01.1998 PCT data prior to European publication