blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0993639
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2001507490Global Dossier 05.06.2001A
Priority number Date
IL9700418 22.12.1997
IL11991496 25.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0993639Global Dossier 19.04.2000A4
EP0993639 19.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
IL9700418 22.12.1997
IL11991496 25.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU5408898 31.07.1998A
Priority number Date
IL9700418 22.12.1997
IL11991496 25.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1027182 13.05.2005A1
Priority number Date
IL9700418 22.12.1997
IL11991496 25.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL130590 29.05.2003A
IL130590D 01.06.2000D0
Priority number Date
IL9700418 22.12.1997
IL11991496 25.12.1996
IL13059097 22.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NO993149L 18.08.1999L
NO993149D 24.06.1999D0
Priority number Date
IL9700418 22.12.1997
IL11991496 25.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TW355767B 11.04.1999B
Priority number Date
IL9700418 22.12.1997
IL11991496 25.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6285976 04.09.2001B1
Priority number Date
US86827897 03.06.1997
US45006099 29.11.1999
IL11991496 25.12.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9829817Global Dossier 09.07.1998A1
Priority number Date
IL11991496 25.12.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1165857C 08.09.2004C
CN1249045 29.03.2000A
Priority number Date
IL11991496 25.12.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
IL119914 29.06.2000A
IL119914D 18.03.1997D0
Priority number Date
IL11991496 25.12.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR20000069716 25.11.2000A
Priority number Date
IL11991496 25.12.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5995739 30.11.1999A
Priority number Date
IL11991496 25.12.1996