Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993639

EP0993639 - DEVICE FOR IMPLEMENTING HIERARCHICAL STATE CHARTS AND METHODS AND APPARATUS USEFUL THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.09.2006
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.09.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.10.2006  [2006/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Emultek Ltd.
Beit Rabin, Teradion Industrial Park
20179 Misgav / IL
[2000/16]
Inventor(s)01 / ROTBART, Frederick, C.
142 Yuvalim Street
20142 Misgav / IL
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date97947856.722.12.1997
[2000/16]
WO1997IL00418
Priority number, dateIL1996011991425.12.1996         Original published format: IL 11991496
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9829817
Date:09.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993639
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.1998
[2000/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US09.07.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/27, G06F17/30, G06F9/44
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/16]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR EINFÜHRUNG VON HIERARCHISCHEN STATUSCHARTS UND VERFAHREN UND GERÄT NÜTZLICH HIERFÜR[2000/16]
English:DEVICE FOR IMPLEMENTING HIERARCHICAL STATE CHARTS AND METHODS AND APPARATUS USEFUL THEREFOR[2000/16]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR L'EXECUTION DE DIAGRAMMES D'ETATS HIERARCHIQUES ET PROCEDES ET APPAREIL UTILISES A CET EFFET[2000/16]
Entry into regional phase23.07.1999National basic fee paid 
23.07.1999Search fee paid 
23.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
23.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/16]
29.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.04.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/41]
17.05.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
04.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
28.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
18.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
22.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200509   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0597646  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-11 * column 1, line 32 - column 4, line 5 *;
 [X]  - KOSKIMIES K ET AL, "AUTOMATIC SYNTHESIS OF STATE MACHINES FROM TRACE DIAGRAMS", SOFTWARE PRACTICE & EXPERIENCE,GB,JOHN WILEY & SONS LTD. CHICHESTER, (19940701), vol. 24, no. 7, ISSN 0038-0644, pages 643 - 658, XP000655465 [X] 1-11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/spe.4380240704
 [A]  - ZIOMEK T, "EFFICIENT, MAINTAINABLE IMPLEMENTATION OF STATE MACHINES IN SOFTWARE", MOTOROLA TECHNICAL DEVELOPMENTS,US,MOTOROLA INC. SCHAUMBURG, ILLINOIS, (19941001), vol. 23, pages 70 - 72, XP000468383 [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PULLI P, "EMBEDDED MICROCONTROLLER OPERATING SYSTEM WITH STATE-MACHINE SUPPORT", MICROPROCESSING AND MICROPROGRAMMING,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BV., AMSTERDAM, (19861201), vol. 18, no. 1 - 05, ISSN 0165-6074, pages 59 - 62, XP002057199 [A] 1-11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-6074(86)90026-8
International search[Y]US5485600  ;
 [Y]US5257363  ;
 [Y]US5163016  ;
 [Y]US5493680