Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992948

EP0992948 - DATA CARRIER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.11.2004
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.01.2005  [2005/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Tokai-Rika-Denki-Seisakusho
1, Aza-Noda, Ohaza-Toyota, Ohguchi-cho
Niwa-gun, Aichi-ken 480-01 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOKAI-RIKA-DENKI-SEISAKUSHO
1, Aza Noda, Ohaza-Toyota, Ohgushi-cho
Niwa-gun, Aichi-ken 480-01 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KOKUBU, Sadao, K.K. Tokai-Rika-Denki-Seisakusho
1, Aza-Noda, Ohaza-Toyota, Ohguchi-cho
Niwagun, Aichi-ken 480-01 / JP
02 / AOKI, Hisashi, K.K. Tokai-Rika-Denki-Seisakusho
1, Aza-Noda, Ohaza-Toyota, Ohguchi-cho
Niwagun, Aichi-ken 480-01 / JP
03 / MIZUNO, Takashi, K.K. Tokai-Rika-Denki-Seisakusho
1, Aza-Noda, Ohaza-Toyota, Ohguchi-cho
Niwagun, Aichi-ken 480-01 / JP
04 / KOGA, Shinichi, K.K. Tokai-Rika-Denki-Seisakusho
1, Aza-Noda, Ohaza-Toyota, Ohguchi-cho
Niwagun, Aichi-ken 480-01 / JP
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Spoor, Brian , et al
Marks & Clerk 144 New Walk
Leicester LE1 7JA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Spoor, Brian , et al
c/o E.N. LEWIS & TAYLOR 144 New Walk
Leicester, LE1 7JA / GB
Application number, filing date97947895.511.12.1997
[2000/15]
WO1997JP04560
Priority number, dateJP1996033223312.12.1996         Original published format: JP 33223396
[2000/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9826375
Date:18.06.1998
Language:EN
[1998/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0992948
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.1998
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search reportJP18.06.1998
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP06.12.2001
ClassificationInternational:G07C5/00, G06K17/00, B60R16/02, G07C5/08
[2002/04]
Former International [2000/15]G07C5/00, G06K17/00, B60R16/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2002/46]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE 
TitleGerman:DATENTRÄGERSYSTEM[2000/15]
English:DATA CARRIER SYSTEM[2000/15]
French:SYSTEME PORTEUR DE DONNEES[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase09.06.1999Translation filed 
11.06.1999National basic fee paid 
11.06.1999Search fee paid 
11.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
11.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.06.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
11.06.1999Examination requested  [2000/15]
02.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/01]
04.08.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200307   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4685061  (WHITAKER CHARLES D [US]) [X] 4-6 * abstract * * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 23 * * column 4, line 39 - line 55 * [Y] 7;
 [X]WO9513594  (MANNESMANN AG [DE], et al) [X] 4,5 * abstract * * page 8, paragraph L - page 9, paragraph 1 *;
 [Y]JPS6297197  ;
 [A]US5379219  (ISHIBASHI WATARU [JP]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 34 * * column 5, line 16 - column 7, line 2 *;
 [A]US5550738  (BAILEY BRIAN L [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 57 * * column 3, line 29 - line 42 * * column 5, line 4 - line 16 *;
 [A]EP0358270  (IND CONTROL SYSTEMS BV [NL]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 9, line 12 - line 24 * * column 14, line 9 - line 16 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871006), vol. 011, no. 305, Database accession no. (P - 623), [Y] 7 * abstract *
International search[Y]JPH02126255U  ;
 [Y]JPH038095  (NIPPON DENSO CO);
 [Y]JPS6297197  (HITACHI LTD)