Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0944868

EP0944868 - VALVE SYSTEM FOR SERVO CONTROL OF FLUID FLOWS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  27.03.2009
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.03.2009Refusal of applicationpublished on 29.04.2009  [2009/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
American Standard International Inc.
15 West 54th Street
New York, New York 10019 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
American Standard International Inc.
15 West 54th Street
New York, New York 10019 / US
Former [2000/35]For all designated states
AMERICAN STANDARD INC.
One Centennial Avenue, P.O. Box 261
Piscataway, New Jersey 08855-6820 / US
Former [2000/34]For all designated states
American Standard International Inc.
15 West 54th Street
New York, New York 10019 / US
Former [1999/39]For all designated states
The Unique Company Limited
Unit E, 77 Cook Street
Auckland / NZ
Inventor(s)01 / HOUGHTON, Bradley
14 Routley Drive Howick
Auckland / NZ
02 / JEROMSON, Peter
5 Bleakhouse Road Howick
Auckland / NZ
03 / WILKINSON, Jamie, John, Aorangi
1/21 Richardson Road Owairaka
Auckland / NZ
04 / BARNES, Peter, Stephen
58 Seaview Road Piha
Auckland / NZ
05 / RUTTEN, Giscard, Hubertus, Theodoor
11 Beachhaven Road
Beachhaven Auckland / NZ
[1999/39]
Representative(s)Bridle, Andrew Barry , et al
HLBBshaw
Merlin House
Falcony Court
Baker's Lane, Epping
Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/17]Bridle, Andrew Barry , et al
HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Former [2004/35]Dearing-Lambert, Peter Richard
Piper Lambert 120 Queens Road
Leicester LE2 3FL / GB
Former [1999/39]Abbie, Andrew Kenneth , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date97948038.112.12.1997
[1999/39]
WO1997NZ00168
Priority number, dateNZ1996029992712.12.1996         Original published format: NZ 29992796
[1999/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9826339
Date:18.06.1998
Language:EN
[1998/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0944868
Date:29.09.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.1998
[1999/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US18.06.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:G05D23/12, G05D23/13, F16K11/074, F16K31/04
[2000/48]
Former International [1999/39]G05D23/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/39]
TitleGerman:VENTILANORDNUNG ZUR SERVOSTEUERUNG VON FLUIDSTRÖMEN[1999/39]
English:VALVE SYSTEM FOR SERVO CONTROL OF FLUID FLOWS[1999/39]
French:SYSTEME DE ROBINET MELANGEUR DESTINE A LA SERVOCOMMANDE D'UN FLUIDE[1999/39]
Entry into regional phase08.07.1999National basic fee paid 
08.07.1999Search fee paid 
08.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
08.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.06.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
09.07.1999Examination requested  [1999/39]
27.08.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
16.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.01.2006Date of oral proceedings
24.02.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
28.02.2006Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/18]
22.02.2009Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/18]
Appeal following examination09.05.2006Appeal received No.  T1451/06
07.07.2006Statement of grounds filed
15.12.2008Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
15.12.2008Date of oral proceedings
18.12.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
15.12.2008Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:11.04.2005Request for further processing filed
13.04.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.05.2005Decision despatched
01.11.2002Request for further processing filed
01.11.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
03.12.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
31.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
27.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
24.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
24.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE3832676  (CONTI ARMATUREN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,9,10,12,13,27 * column 1, line 14 - column 2, line 12; figures 1-3 * [Y] 2,4-8,11,14-26,28;
 [Y]US4653538  (TSUTSUI OSAMU [JP], et al) [Y] 2,14,16-23 * column A; figures 1-23 *;
 [Y]FR2524105  (HANSA METALLWERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 4-6 * figures 1,2; claims 1,6 *;
 [Y]US4610393  (RODRIGUEZ JEAN-JACQUES [FR]) [Y] 7,8,11 * column 5, line 1 - line 9; figures 7,8 *;
 [Y]EP0297883  (ARMITAGE SHANKS LTD [GB]) [Y] 15 * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 58; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US5358177  (CASHMORE PETER R [GB]) [Y] 24-26,28 * column A; figures 2-4 *;
 [A]US5504950  (NATALIZIA MARK L [US], et al) [A] 1-3,9,10,13,14,16,18-20 * column 3, line 35 - column 6, line 34; figures 1,4,10,13-16 *;
 [A]EP0272699  (TOTO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4431028  (HENDRICK FRED W [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 57; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]US4673160  (TOLLEY PATRICK [CA]) [A] 1-3,9,10,14,16,17,23 * column A; figures 1,5,7 *;
 [A]EP0042523  (PORCHER ETS [FR]) [A] 7,8,11 * figures 19,20 *
International search[X]US3363536
 [Y]US3810602
 [A]US5417083
 [A]US5014748
 [A]US4889315
 [A]US4700885
 [A]US4558817