Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971608

EP0971608 - BACKPACK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.05.2002
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 05.01.2005  [2005/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Global Act Aktiebolag
Litorinavägen 19D
260 93 Torekov / SE
[2000/42]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Global Act AB
Storgatan 28
260 93 Torekov / SE
Inventor(s)01 / BLANKING, Jonas
Östra Ryttmästargatan 1
S-217 52 Malmö / SE
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Thylén, Eva Matilda , et al
AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Thylén, Eva Matilda , et al
AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
Application number, filing date97948082.905.12.1997
[2000/03]
WO1997SE02032
Priority number, dateUS19970035766P06.01.1997         Original published format: US 35766 P
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9830126
Date:16.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971608
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.1998
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971608
Date:25.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE16.07.1998
ClassificationInternational:A45F3/04
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:RUCKSACK[2000/03]
English:BACKPACK[2000/03]
French:SAC A DOS[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase08.07.1999National basic fee paid 
08.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
08.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
08.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
22.10.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
07.03.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.03.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
05.07.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
08.09.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.10.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
28.12.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
25.01.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.03.2001Fee for grant paid
24.03.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP00202350.5  / EP1051928
Opposition(s)26.04.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
06.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE25.07.2001
FI25.07.2001
DK25.10.2001
PT25.10.2001
GR26.10.2001
IE05.12.2001
LU05.12.2001
[2005/01]
Former [2004/42]BE25.07.2001
FI25.07.2001
DK25.10.2001
PT25.10.2001
IE05.12.2001
LU05.12.2001
Former [2004/39]BE25.07.2001
FI25.07.2001
DK25.10.2001
PT25.10.2001
LU05.12.2001
Former [2003/46]BE25.07.2001
FI25.07.2001
DK25.10.2001
PT25.10.2001
Former [2002/29]BE25.07.2001
FI25.07.2001
PT25.10.2001
Former [2002/27]FI25.07.2001
PT25.10.2001
Former [2002/15]FI25.07.2001
Cited inInternational search[A]US5370287  ;
 [A]US3679108  ;
 [A]US3622056  ;
 [A]EP0748599  ;
 [AP]WO9717866