Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1015903

EP1015903 - SIMULTANEOUS ACQUISITION OF SPATIAL BASIS FUNCTIONS: ULTRA-FAST IMAGING WITH RADIOFREQUENCY COIL ARRAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/27]SIMULTAEOUS ACQUISITION OF SPATIAL HARMONICS (SMASH): ULTRA-FAST IMAGING WITH RADIOFREQUENCY COIL ARRAYS
[2002/29]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.04.2004
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.06.2004  [2004/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, Inc.
Office of Corporate Research, 1 Deaconess Road
Boston, MA 02215 / US
[2002/17]
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, Inc.
330 Brookline Avenue, RN-227
Boston, MA 02215 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SODICKSON, Daniel, Kevin
Apartment 12-D, 1105 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Hutchins, Michael Richard , et al
FRY HEATH & SPENCE LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley
Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]Hutchins, Michael Richard , et al
FRY HEATH & SPENCE The Old College 53 High Street
Horley Surrey RH6 7BN / GB
Application number, filing date97948164.505.11.1997
[2000/27]
WO1997US20068
Priority number, dateUS1996074635812.11.1996         Original published format: US 746358
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9821600
Date:22.05.1998
Language:EN
[1998/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1015903
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1998
[2000/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1015903
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.05.1998
ClassificationInternational:G01R33/3415
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/27]
TitleGerman:GLEICHZEITIGE AUFZEICHNUNG RÄUMLICHER BASISFUNKTIONEN: SCHNELLE BILDERFASSUNG MIT HILFE VON RADIOFREQUENZ-SPULENANORDNUNGEN[2002/29]
English:SIMULTANEOUS ACQUISITION OF SPATIAL BASIS FUNCTIONS: ULTRA-FAST IMAGING WITH RADIOFREQUENCY COIL ARRAYS[2002/29]
French:ACQUISITION SIMULTANEE DE FONCTIONS DE BASE SPATIALES: IMAGERIE EXTREMEMENT RAPIDE A L'AIDE D'UN GROUPEMENT DE BOBINES DE FREQUENCE RADIOELECTRIQUE[2002/29]
Former [2000/27]GLEICHZEITIGE AUFZEICHNUNG DER RÄUMLICHEN HARMONISCHEN(SMASH):SCHNELLE BILDERFASSUNG MIT HILFE VON RADIOFREQUENZ-SPULENANORDNUNGEN
Former [2000/27]SIMULTAEOUS ACQUISITION OF SPATIAL HARMONICS (SMASH): ULTRA-FAST IMAGING WITH RADIOFREQUENCY COIL ARRAYS
Former [2000/27]ACQUISITION SIMULTANEE D'HARMONIQUES SPATIALES: IMAGERIE EXTREMEMENT RAPIDE A L'AIDE D'UN GROUPEMENT DE BOBINES DE FREQUENCE RADIOELECTRIQUE
Entry into regional phase11.06.1999National basic fee paid 
11.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
11.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.06.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.06.1999Examination requested  [2000/27]
02.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2002Date of oral proceedings
13.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.06.2002Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
20.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.03.2003Fee for grant paid
27.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP02011913.7  / EP1243938
Opposition(s)12.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23]
Request for further processing for:17.04.2003Request for further processing filed
27.03.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.04.2003Decision despatched
27.03.2003Request for further processing filed
27.03.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.04.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
17.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
21.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
02.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[DX]US4857846  (CARLSON JOSEPH W [US]) [DX] 1-10,13-15,18-22 * column 3, line 40 - column 6, line 8 * * column 6, line 45 - column 14, line 29; figures 1-5 *;
 [X]EP0472390  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-4,6,8-10,13-15,18-22 * page 4, line 19 - page 9, line 55; figures 5-9 *;
 [X]EP0513987  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1-5,8,10,13,14,18-22 * page 10, line 40 - page 10, line 52 * * page 12, line 40 - page 13, line 7; figures 11,19 *;
 [DX]  - CARLSON J W ET AL, "Imaging time reduction through multiple receiver coil data acquisition and image reconstruction", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, MAY 1993, USA, ISSN 0740-3194, vol. 29, no. 5, pages 681 - 687, XP000367413 [DX] 1-10,13,15,18-22 * see the whole document *
 [DX]  - KWIAT D ET AL, "A decoupled coil detector array for fast image acquisition in magnetic resonance imaging", MEDICAL PHYSICS, MARCH-APRIL 1991, USA, ISSN 0094-2405, vol. 18, no. 2, pages 251 - 265, XP000228811 [DX] 1-4,10,13,14,16,18-22 * see the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1118/1.596723
 [DA]  - KWIAT D ET AL, "Preliminary experimental evaluation of an inverse source imaging procedure using a decoupled coil detector array in magnetic resonance imaging", MEDICAL ENGINEERING & PHYSICS, JUNE 1995, UK, ISSN 1350-4533, vol. 17, no. 4, pages 257 - 263, XP002058295 [DA] 1-4,10,13,14,16,18-22

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/1350-4533(95)90850-B
ExaminationEP0412824